Zurich American Insurance Company v. Grace Pacific LLC

Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Grace Pacific LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00156
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice Of All Claims And Parties Zurich American Insurance Company. (Grable, Paul)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00156DKW-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/19. (apg, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 EO: Based on the parties' representations that the underlying litigation has settled, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2019 is VACATED. No later than 6/17/2019, the parties shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents to watson_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this EO on Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grable, Paul)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Grace Pacific LLC. (emt, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brandt, George)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Brandt, George)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 5/23/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00156 DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Grace Pacific LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2177314.), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Main Document (Proposed) Summons )(Brandt, George) Modified on 3/28/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Grace Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: George W. Brandt
Represented By: Paul R. Grable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Pacific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?