Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc. v. BYD Motors Inc.

Plaintiff: Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc.
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, BYD Motors Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Count V Of The First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 Table of Authorities, #3 Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #22 MOTION to Dismiss Count V Of The First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing is set for 8/2/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Count V Of The First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Christian K. Adams appearing for Defendant BYD Motors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Certificate of Service)(Adams, Christian)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 EO: Due to availability of Plaintiff's counsel, with joint agreement of opposing counsel, the Early Settlement Conference previously set for 07/01/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/18/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement conference statements are due by 07/11/2019. Counsel Jeffrey P. Miller to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against BYD Motors Inc., filed by Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION For Leave To File First Amended Complaint and For Withdrawal of Motion To Dismiss Without Prejudice; ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI(cib)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 Letter addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from Christian K. Adams, Esq., dated May 31, 2019 re: Response to the Court's Order at the Status Conference held on Wednesday, May 22, 2019 #16 . (cib)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 EO: #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Re: Count V of the Complaint currently set for 7/12/2019 at 09:45 AM is deemed Withdrawn Without Prejudice and terminated and the hearing date is Vacated. terminating #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 EP: Status Conference held on 5/22/2019. (Court Reporter Ann Matsumoto) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Plaintiff's Attorney Jeffrey P. Miller's Letter Request is Granted and terminated. re 14 Correspondence. Status Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 01:30 PM is continued to 5/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Status Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM is moved to 01:30 PM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED EO: Status Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Status Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/1/2019. (cib)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim re Count V of the Complaint : Motion Hearing is set for 7/12/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 WITHDRAWN. SEE EO #17 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim re Count V of the Complaint Christian K. Adams appearing for Defendant BYD Motors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Adams, Christian) Modified on 6/5/2019
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates are given. Court to prepare a Scheduling Order. Also present is Robert Soderholm. Non-Jury Trial is set for 04/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 03/17/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 07/01/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 01/21/2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/27/2019. Discovery due by 02/28/2020. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:36 - 9:42.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement By Defendant BYD Motors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Adams, Christian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from Circuit Court Of The First Circuit State of Hawaii; Their case number: CV 19-1-0327-02 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Civil Information Sheet, #3 State Court Documents) (cib) Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in the United States District Court For The District of Hawaii was filed with the notice of removal with attachments re #1 .
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00160 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BYD Motors Inc. from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-0327-02. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2178576), filed by BYD Motors Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Adams, Christian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc. v. BYD Motors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYD Motors Inc.
Represented By: Nenad Krek
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soderholm Sales and Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?