Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al. v. Qazi Muhammad Zarlish et al.
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC and Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Hoan Pham, Nghi Phan Nhat, Qazi Muhammad Zarlish, Vishnudath Reddy Mangilpudi and Pebblebridge Technologies, LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00168
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's requests set forth in the #24 Scheduling Conference Statement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/11/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 08/20/2019. Counsel Kerry S. Culpepper to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nghi Phan Nhat. (cib)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Qazi Muhammad Zarlish. (cib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC re #26 First MOTION for Entry of Default AGAINST DEFENDANTS QAZI MUHAMMAD ZARLISH AND NGHI PHAN NHAT (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 First REQUEST for Entry of Default AGAINST DEFENDANTS QAZI MUHAMMAD ZARLISH AND NGHI PHAN NHAT Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Entry of Default Qazi, #3 Proposed Entry of Default Nghi)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified docket text on 7/9/2019 (cib).
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 Supplemental Declaration re #21 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT HOAN PHAM, 23 Order on Ex Parte Motion,,,, DECLARATION OF COUNSEL; EXHIBITS 1 AND 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EO: On June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs filed their #21 Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Hoan Pham ("Ex Parte Motion"). Plaintiffs filed the Ex Parte Motion without a supporting declaration that authenticates the exhibits attached to the Ex Parte Motion. On July 1, 2019, Plaintiffs filed their #22 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendant Hoan Pham (DOC. #21) ("Motion to Supplement"), which seeks to supplement the Ex Parte Motion with additional facts. The Motion to Supplement does not address or resolve the lack of a declaration in support of the Ex Parte Motion.Based on the statements therein, the Court GRANTS the #22 Motion to Supplement. The Court also ORDERS Plaintiffs' counsel to file a declaration in support of the #21 Ex Parte Motion. Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental brief and Plaintiffs' counsel shall file his declaration by 07/05/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 07/02/2019. (mansfield2)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT HOAN PHAM [DOC. #21] Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Culpepper, Kerry)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT HOAN PHAM Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Culpepper, Kerry)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nghi Phan Nhat served on 6/5/2019 filed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Delivery, #2 Tracking History showing Delivery)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 6/12/2019 to add service date (cib).
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, Summons, Scheduling Order and Vietnamese machine translation has been served by Fed Ex, via the Clerk of Court to : Nghi Phan Nhat, Hoan Pham, pursinat to Order Granting Plaintiff's Second Ex Parte Motion for Order Permitting Clerk to Perform Foreign Mailing, ECF #17 . Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (apg, ) (apg, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Supplement Fed Ex Package Slip Information) (apg, ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 EO: To allow Plaintiffs additional time to serve the Complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/03/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/11/2019, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 07/03/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING CLERK TO PERFORM FOREIGN MAILING re: #16 "For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to provide the Clerks Office with all required documents in addressed, postage prepaid, FedEx envelopes. Plaintiffs shall indicate their attorney's business address as the return address on the envelopes. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/22/2019 (jo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITING CLERK TO PERFORM FOREIGN MAILING Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 EX PARTE Motion FOR ORDER PERMITING CLERK TO PERFORM FOREIGN MAILING Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 First AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bodyguard Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC. Qazi Muhammad Zarlish; waiver sent on 4/4/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 4/26/2019 (jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Vishnudath Reddy Mangilpudi, Nghi Phan Nhat, Pebblebridge Technologies, LLP, Hoan Pham. (cib)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Qazi Muhammad Zarlish. (cib)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 3, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - On 4/3/2019, a copy of #1 Complaint and #3 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (jo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00168 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al. (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) (Culpepper, Kerry) Docket Text Modified on 4/3/2019 (jo)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al. identifying Corporate Parent Lost Dog Productions, LLC, Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC, Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc., Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc., Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc., Other Affiliate Voltage Productions, LLC for Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al... (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, INDUCEMENT, FALSE ADVERTISING, UNFAIR COMPETITION, AND DECEPTIVE TRADE PRACTICES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2180832.), filed by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Declaration of Daniel Arheidt, #11 Declaration of Eric Smith, #12 Declaration of Counsel, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc et al. v. Qazi Muhammad Zarlish et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nghi Phan Nhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qazi Muhammad Zarlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishnudath Reddy Mangilpudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pebblebridge Technologies, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBV Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?