Gottlieb v. Gottlieb
Plaintiff: Sean Alan Gottlieb
Defendant: Melanie Faith Gottlieb
Case Number: 1:2019cv00170
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Action Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Melanie Faith Gottlieb. (Rebman, Alethea)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 EO: The Court GRANTS #11 Defendant's request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file a response to the Complaint no later than 6/7/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 First REQUEST an extension of time to answer complaint by Melanie Faith Gottlieb. (Rebman, Alethea)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alethea K. Rebman on behalf of Melanie Faith Gottlieb on behalf of Melanie Faith Gottlieb. (Rebman, Alethea)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00170LEK-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 ). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 EO: To allow sufficient time for service to be completed and for Defendant to file a response to the Complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 5/30/2019 to 7/17/2019 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 18, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a certified copy of the #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS shall be served by First Class Mail to Sean Alan Gottlieb at the address of record on April 19, 2019. The following documents shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Gottlieb: 1) certified copy the #1 Complaint, #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference with Corporate Disclosure Memo, #5 issued summons; #6 Civil Waiver of Service Packet and a USM-285 form. Additionally, a certified copy of the #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS shall be served to the U.S. Marshals Service via interoffice delivery. (emt, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter to Plaintiff Sean Alan Gottlieb re #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, dated April 18, 2019. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019: #1 Transmittal Letter) (emt, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/18/2019) (emt, ).
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Melanie Gottlieb. (emt, )
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #2 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/18/2019. This Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to issue the summons and to provide Plaintiff with the instructions and all other forms necessary for the United States Marshals Service ("Marshals Service") to attempt service of the Complaint. (emt, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Sean Alan Gottlieb. (cib)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melanie Faith Gottlieb and Jury Demand filed by Sean Alan Gottlieb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb v. Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Faith Gottlieb
Represented By: Alethea K. Rebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Alan Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?