Tylor v. Reo Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Krzysztof Borko, Krzysztof Kris Borko, Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Reo Realty LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00175
Filed: April 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal (VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) F.R.C.P. AS TO ALL PARTIES AND ALL CLAIMS) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
May 29, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #12 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 on May 29, 2019. (emt, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2019 is CONTINUED to 7/1/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00175HG-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 05/08/2019. (apg, )
April 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Krzysztof Borko served on 4/11/2019. (emt, )
April 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Reo Realty LLC served on 4/11/2019. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii, using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/3/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Krzysztof Borko, Reo Realty LLC. (emt, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00175 HG-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2182507.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 3), #3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit B (part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Reo Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzysztof Borko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krzysztof Kris Borko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reo Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?