Carnate v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Paulino M. Carnate
Defendant: Roe "Non Profit" Corporations 1-10, Roe Governmental Entities 1-10, Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Persons 1-10 and Hilton Resorts Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 EO: On June 26, 2019, Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation filed:DEFENDANT HILTON RESORTS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT I (ECF No. #26 ).Plaintiff shall file his Opposition on or before Friday, July 26, 2019.Defendant shall file its Reply on or before Friday, August 9, 2019.The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I (ECF No. #26 ) is set for Monday, September 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) (ECF NO. #16 ) is CONTINUED to Monday, September 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., at the same time as Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 Errata re #27 Concise Statement of Facts,, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Berg, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 27 CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Count I filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ciera Pope, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Andrew L. Pepper, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Declaration of Allyson Meldeau, #10 Declaration of Eduardo "Ed" Andrews, #11 Declaration of Elton Akana, #12 Declaration of Hiram Higashida, #13 Declaration of Adam Smith, #14 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Count I Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Paulino M. Carnate. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hong, Ted)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 EO: On May 29, 2019, the Court issued a briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext). (ECF No. #20 ).Plaintiff Paulino M. Carnate was to file his Opposition on or before Thursday, June 13, 2019. The hearing was set for July 1, 2019.At the request of Plaintiff, on June 5, 2019, the Court continued the hearing date from July 1, 2019 to July 18, 2019. The Court did not alter the briefing schedule deadlines. Plaintiff did not file an Opposition by June 13, 2019.On June 20, 2019, Defendant filed a Reply. (ECF No. #23 ).The Court CONTINUES the briefing schedule as follows:Plaintiff shall file his Opposition on or before Thursday, June 27, 2019.Defendant may file an additional Reply on or before Friday, July 5, 2019.The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) remains set for Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 EO: The Court grants Plaintiff's request, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #16 ) previously set for 7/1/2019 is hereby CONTINUED to Thursday, July 18, 2019 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST to reschedule the hearing, scheduled for July 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. by Paulino M. Carnate. (Hong, Ted)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On May 22, 2019, Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation filed:DEFENDANT HILTON RESORTS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III (PRETEXT) (ECF No. #16 ).Plaintiff Paulino M. Carnate shall file his Opposition on or before Thursday, June 13, 2019.Defendant shall file its Reply on or before Thursday, June 27, 2019.A hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #16 ) shall be held on Monday, July 1, 2019, at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.(rls, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/29/2019. (emt, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - (AMENDED)Discussion held.Counsel intend to opt out of initial disclosures.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 6/2/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Gillmor.An Early Settlement Conference is set for 8/22/19 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Confidential settlement conference letters are due by 8/15/19.Mr. Pepper informed the Court that he will be filing a motion for summary judgment within a couple of weeks.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given:Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 6/2/2020 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/22/2020 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Settlement Conference is set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/2/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, ) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 EP: : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion held.Counsel intend to opt out of initial disclosures.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 6/2/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Gillmor.An Early Settlement Conference is set for 8/22/19 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Confidential settlement conference letters are due by 8/15/19.Mr. Pepper informed the Court that he will be filing a motion for summary judgment within a couple of weeks.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 6/2/2020 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/21/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/22/2020 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Settlement Conference is set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 3/3/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/2/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paulino M. Carnate. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation served on 5/7/2019 . (Hong, Ted) Modified on 5/14/2019 (emt, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 EO: The Court reschedules the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/19 @ 9:00 AM to 5/29/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 5/22/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Ted Hong is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/19 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hong, Ted)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Hilton Resorts Corporation. (emt, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Hong, Ted)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Paulino M. Carnate. (Hong, Ted)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation dba Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC filed by Paulino M. Carnate. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Trial by Jury)(Hong, Ted) Modified on 4/30/2019 (emt, ).
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Pepper, Andrew)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint). (Pepper, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 5/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00178 HG-RT on all further pleadings.(jo)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Grand Vacations Borrower, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilton Resorts Corporation for Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC. (Pepper, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, case number 19-1-067K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2182904), filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnate v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Persons 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Resorts Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino M. Carnate
Represented By: Ted H.S. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?