United States Fire Insurance Company v. Prieto

Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Nicolas Prieto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Pursuant to Steven Kim's request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 8/14/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 8/7/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement (Plaintiff United States Fire Insurance Company's Scheduling Conference Statement). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miller, Richard)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Nicholas Prieto's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Kim, Steven) Modified on 5/15/2019 (emt, ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nicolas Prieto.(Kim, Steven)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Fire Insurance Company. Nicolas Prieto served on 5/6/2019 . (Miller, Richard) Modified on 5/10/2019 (emt, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Miller, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (AMENDED) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new case number CV 19-00186 JAO-RT on all future pleadings . (emt, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Nicolas Prieto (jo)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 6/6/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00186 JAO-RLP on all further pleadings.(jo)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miller, Richard)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Nicolas Prieto ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2185120.), filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fire Insurance Company v. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: David R. Harada-Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Prieto
Represented By: Steven Jon Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?