Gutina v. Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Plaintiff: Shaunna Gutina
Defendant: Renee Furuta-Barnum and Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shaunna Gutina PLAINTIFFS FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS: INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF STATEMENTS TO DEFENDANT LAW OFFICES OF MARVIN S.C. DANG, LLLC (Brackett, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/24/2019. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/24/2019. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/24/2019. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/24/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Based on counsel's request and agreement, jury trial is set for 12/1/2020. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 12/1/2020 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Early Settlement Conference is set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 8/19/2019. Settlement Conference is set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 8/26/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/1/2020. Discovery due by 10/2/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:45 a.m. - 9:55 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Minkin, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC [Re: Defendants Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC and Renee Furuta-Barnum's Rule 68 Offer of Judgment] (Minkin, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Brackett, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2019 is CONTINUED to 6/24/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/20/2019. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00189 HG-WRP on all further filings. (emt, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Minkin, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Miyoko T. Pettit-Toledo on behalf of Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC on behalf of Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Pettit-Toledo, Miyoko)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan K. Inafuku on behalf of Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC on behalf of Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (Inafuku, Jordan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC and Renee Furuta-Barnum's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Renee Furuta-Barnum, Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC.(Minkin, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaunna Gutina. Renee Furuta-Barnum served on 4/15/2019 . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shaunna Gutina. Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC served on 4/15/2019 . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 4/17/2019 (emt, ).
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/10/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Renee Furuta-Barnum. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00189 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2185499.), filed by Shaunna Gutina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Verification of Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) Modified on 4/12/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutina v. Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Furuta-Barnum
Represented By: Jordan K. Inafuku
Represented By: Miyoko T. Pettit-Toledo
Represented By: David J. Minkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Marvin S.C. Dang, LLLC
Represented By: Jordan K. Inafuku
Represented By: Miyoko T. Pettit-Toledo
Represented By: David J. Minkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaunna Gutina
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?