International Masonry Training and Education Foundation et al v. Hawaii Masons' Training Fund et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees and International Masonry Training and Education Foundation
Defendant: Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Hawaii Masons, Peter Iriarte, Michael Mazzone, Claude Matsumoto, Albert Mandac, Tryson Mook, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane and Francis Pascual
Case Number: 1:2019cv00206
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint In its Entirety Judy Mutsuye Iriye appearing for Defendants Glen Kaneshige, Claude Matsumoto, Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Darlean Kiyokane, Francis Pascual, Peter Iriarte, Albert Mandac, Tryson Mook, Michael Mazzone (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 To Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, #5 [Proposed] Order)(Iriye, Judy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 EO: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss. ECF No. #32 . The Court sets a July 3, 2019 deadline for Defendants to file a new motion to dismiss, consistent with the representations in the joint letter. The Court will thereafter issue a hearing date, taking into account the parties' proposed briefing schedule. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO STEVEN E. KAPLAN re: #30 and #35 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/3/2019. STEVEN E. KAPLAN, ESQ. (Law Firm: Littler Medelson, PC) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants (jo)
May 23, 2019 Filing 35 Amended Declaration re #30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Steven E. Kaplan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2204857. for Steven E. Kaplan. (Yoshida, Randal)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MELISSA HARCLERODE re: #31 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/22/2019. MELISSA HARCLERODE, ESQ. (Law Firm: Littler Mendelson, PC added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants (jo)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KEVIN L. WRIGHT re: #29 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/22/2019. KEVIN L. WRIGHT, ESQ. (Law Firm: Littler Mendelson, PC) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants (jo)
May 22, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #27 Status Conference,,, Per Court's May 16, 2019 Order filed by Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual. (Iriye, Judy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Harclerode Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2204858.Randal S. Yoshida appearing for Defendants Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Yoshida, Randal) Docket Text Modified on 5/21/2019 (jo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Steven E. Kaplan Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2204857.Randal S. Yoshida appearing for Defendants Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Yoshida, Randal) Docket Text Modified on 5/21/2019 (jo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Kevin L. Wright Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2204854.Randal S. Yoshida appearing for Defendants Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Yoshida, Randal) Docket Text Modified on 5/21/2019 (jo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S. Yoshida on behalf of Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual on behalf of Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual. (Yoshida, Randal)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE held.Discussion held regarding the Motion to Dismiss and briefs filed in the District of Maryland (attached in docket no. #19 Transfer Documents).Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held in abeyance until after the Motion to Dismiss has been resolved.Discussed 2 options on how to proceed with a Motion to Dismiss.1. Parties to stand on the filed and briefed Motion to Dismiss with no supplemental filings (attached in docket no. #19 Transfer Documents)2. Parties to re-file a Motion to Dismiss and briefings in this DistrictParties request for an extended time to submit Letter Briefs to allow them time to consult with their clients on how to proceed. Letter Briefs are due by Wednesday, May 22, 2020 and shall be electronically filed directly on CM/ECF. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Mutsuye Iriye on behalf of Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual on behalf of Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, Francis Pascual. (Iriye, Judy)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO RICHARD S. SIEGEL re: #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/8/2019. RICHARD S. SIEGEL, ESQ. (Law Firm: Slevin & Hart, P.C.) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs (jo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARC H. RIFKIND re: #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/8/2019. MARC H. RIFKIND, ESQ. (Law Firm: Slevin & hart, P.C.) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs (jo)
May 2, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket numbers #22 and #23 , filed by Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation, contain Orders that require the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the ORDER to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (jo)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Richard S. Siegel) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2194999.Sean Kim appearing for Plaintiffs Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Sean)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Marc H. Rifkind) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2194998.Sean Kim appearing for Plaintiffs Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Sean)
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF HEARING: Court sets a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 05/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (bbb)
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Kim on behalf of Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation on behalf of Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kim, Sean)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case Transferred in from District of Maryland (Greenbelt); Case Number 8:18-cv-03320-PX. Original file with documents numbered 1-18, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (DOCKET SHEET and Attachments: #1 Complaint Against All Defendants, #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation, #3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, Peter Iriarte, Glen Kaneshige, Darlean Kiyokane, Albert Mandac, Claude Matsumoto, Michael Mazzone, Tryson Mook, and Francis Pascual, #4 NOTICE by Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation to Issue Corrected Summons to Defendant Francis Pascual, #5 Summons Reissued as to Francis Pascual, #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, #7 MOTION to Transfer Case to Hawaii, MOTION to Dismiss by Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Reply as to 8, #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melissa M. Harclerode, #10 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Hawaii MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Trustees, International Masonry Training and Education Foundation, #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Reply by Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, #12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Hawaii MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Hawaii Masons' Training Fund, #13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis, #14 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Transfer) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Masonry Training and Education Foundation et al v. Hawaii Masons' Training Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Masons' Training Fund
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Masons
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Iriarte
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mazzone
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Matsumoto
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Mandac
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tryson Mook
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Kaneshige
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlean Kiyokane
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Pascual
Represented By: Steven E Kaplan
Represented By: Melissa Marjorie Harclerode
Represented By: Kevin L. Wright
Represented By: Steven E. Kaplan
Represented By: Randal S. Yoshida
Represented By: Judy Mutsuye Iriye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees
Represented By: Marc H. Rifkind
Represented By: Richard Siegel
Represented By: Richard S Siegel
Represented By: Sean Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Masonry Training and Education Foundation
Represented By: Marc H Rifkind
Represented By: Richard Siegel
Represented By: Marc H. Rifkind
Represented By: Richard S Siegel
Represented By: Sean Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?