Barnes v. Henry
Appellee: Kristin Kimo Henry
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Trustee: Howard M.S. Hu
Appellant: Chad Barry Barnes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00212
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Completion of Record) (emt, )
April 26, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASES has been served by First Class Mail to Kristin Kimo Henry at the address of record on April 26, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/25/2019. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON and MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for all further proceedings. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE, MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00212 DKW-RT on all future pleadings . (emt, )
April 24, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 2 Notice of Case Assignment shall be served by First Class Mail to Kristin Kimo Henry at the address of record on April 25, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00212 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL TO DISTRICT COURT: NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 14-01475. filed by Chad Barry Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Order Denying Barnes' Motion to Stay Discharge and Lift Protective Order, #3 Docket Sheet, Bankruptcy Petition # 14-01475) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kristin Kimo Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Howard M.S. Hu
Represented By: Howard M.S. Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chad Barry Barnes
Represented By: Jay L Friedheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?