Brooks v. Green
Plaintiff: Lynn Brooks and Andrew Weldon
Defendant: Juan Ramirez, Surf N' Sea, Inc., Adrian and Joe Green
Case Number: 1:2019cv00219
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Plaintiff's Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting)(O'Connell, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Juan Ramirez on behalf of Juan Ramirez. (Madriaga, Jamie Christine)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nakano on behalf of Juan Ramirez on behalf of Juan Ramirez. (Nakano, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Juan Ramirez.(Lezy, Normand)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Defendant Juan Adrian Ramirez by Juan Ramirez.(Lezy, Normand)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Surf N' Sea, Inc.. (Grimmer, Gary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Correa on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc. on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc.. (Correa, Ann)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint [Defendants Joe Green and Surf N' Sea, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint] by Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc..(Grimmer, Gary)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Gary G. Grimmer on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc. on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc. (Grimmer, Gary) Docket Text Modified on 6/14/2019 (jo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary G. Grimmer on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc. on behalf of Joe Green, Surf N' Sea, Inc.. (Grimmer, Gary)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 EO: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 7/15/2019 to 7/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Because no defendant has appeared, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 6/21/2019 to 7/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Surf N' Sea, Inc. served on 5/16/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Joe Green served on 5/16/2019 (jo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Juan Ramirez served on 5/14/2019 (jo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00219 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 . (emt, ) Modified on 5/13/2019 (emt, ).
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Defendant Juan Ramirez (jo)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendant Surf N' Sea, Inc. (jo)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendant Joe Green (jo)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (O'Connell, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (O'Connell, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (O'Connell, John)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/21/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00219 JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Lynn Brooks ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2191993.), filed by Lynn Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet)(O'Connell, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ramirez
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surf N' Sea, Inc.
Represented By: Gary G. Grimmer
Represented By: Ann Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Green
Represented By: Gary G. Grimmer
Represented By: Ann Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Brooks
Represented By: John T. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Weldon
Represented By: John T. O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?