United States of America et al v. Waste Management of Hawaii, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: State of Hawaii Department of Health and United States of America
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu and Waste Management of Hawaii, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00224
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT DECREE - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 7/3/2019. (jo)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO ENTER CONSENT DECREE re: #7 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 7/3/2019. (jo)
June 24, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entry #7 Consent MOTION re #2 Notice (Other) Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree filed by State of Hawaii Department of Health, United States of America contains a Proposed Order. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (jo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION re #2 Notice (Other) Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree Davis H. Forsythe appearing for Plaintiffs State of Hawaii Department of Health, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Order)(Forsythe, Davis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 EO: Government informs the Court that they intend to file a motion for entry of the consent decree. Therefore, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/24/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/23/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/24/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00224 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by State of Hawaii Department of Health, United States of America of Lodging and Request for No Action State of Hawaii Department of Health, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Consent Decree)(Forsythe, Davis) Docket Text Modified on 7/3/2019 (jo)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City and County of Honolulu, Waste Management of Hawaii, Inc., filed by United States of America, State of Hawaii Department of Health. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forsythe, Davis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Waste Management of Hawaii, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii Department of Health
Represented By: Edward G. Bohlen
Represented By: Diane K. Taira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Davis H. Forsythe
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Hawaii, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?