Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. MartinRoberts Design LLC
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: MartinRoberts Design LLC, Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Shaun C. Sparks, William Dode Martin, II, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00225
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 EO: The Court CONVERTS the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/19 @ 9:00 AM to a Status Conference which remains set for 9/4/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Defendants not present.Mr. Melchinger stated that service was executed upon the defendants, and he has had no contact with any of them. Mr. Melchinger will be filing an entry of default.This Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to 9/4/19 @ 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/4/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #15 Scheduling Conference Statement, #14 Report of Planning Meeting, #13 Certificate of Service [AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Re: 1) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures, 2) Plaintiff's Report of the Parties Planning Meeting, and 3) Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement)], (Melchinger, Glenn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Notice of Automatic Stay; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Melchinger, Glenn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Melchinger, Glenn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting Plaintiff's Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Melchinger, Glenn)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Certificate of Service [Re: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures] (Melchinger, Glenn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Defendant William Dode Martin, II served on 6/1/2019. (Melchinger, Glenn) Docket Text Modified on 6/12/2019 (jo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to William Dode Martin, II. (Melchinger, Glenn)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: Defendant Shaun C. Sparks served on 5/14/2019. (Melchinger, Glenn) Docket Text Modified on 5/29/2019 (jo)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.: Defendant MartinRoberts Design LLC served on 5/14/2019 through Shaun C. Sparks. (Melchinger, Glenn) Docket Text Modified on 5/29/2019 (jo)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/1/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MartinRoberts Design LLC, William Dode Martin, II, Shaun C. Sparks. (emt, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00225 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Melchinger, Glenn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Melchinger, Glenn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Melchinger, Glenn)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; EXHIBITS 1 - 6; SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2194267.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Redacted] 12/31/2007 Business Line Direct Credit Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Redacted] 12/31/2007 Business Card Lines APP, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1/1/2008 Customer Direct, #4 Exhibit 4 - 11/1/2007 Business Card, #5 Exhibit 5 - [Redacted] 10/11/2018 Statements, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1/30/2019 Demand letter)(Melchinger, Glenn) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/1/2019) (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. MartinRoberts Design LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MartinRoberts Design LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun C. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dode Martin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Represented By: Paul Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?