Santos, et al v. McAleenan, et al
Plaintiff: Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos and Patricia Marchetti Maia
Defendant: Jeffrey Sawyer, Lee Francis Cissna, Christopher M. Robinson, David Gulick and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00229
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 6/28/2019. (jo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/28/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 7/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 4/1/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 EO: The Court GRANTS #27 Defendant's Motion for Defendant's Counsel to Appear Telephonically to Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The Court will contact Defendant's counsel at the number provided. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Defendant's Counsel to Appear Telephonically to Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Cara E. Alsterberg appearing for Defendants Lee Francis Cissna, David Gulick, Kevin McAleenan, Christopher M. Robinson, Jeffrey Sawyer (Alsterberg, Cara)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant United States of America's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Alsterberg, Cara) Docket Text Modified on 6/24/2019 (jo)
June 13, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiffs' Rule 16.2(b) Scheduling Conference Statement . (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 6/24/2019 (jo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Cara E. Alsterberg on behalf of Lee Francis Cissna, David Gulick, Kevin McAleenan, Christopher M. Robinson, Jeffrey Sawyer (Alsterberg, Cara)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos. Defendants Kevin McAleenan and Francis Lee Cissna, National Director of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served by mail at the Office of the Attorney General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Washington D.C. 200528. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 5/30/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos. Jeffrey Sawyer served on 5/9/2019, through Christina Lara, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, on behalf of the US Attorney's Office, District of Hawaii. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 5/30/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos. Christopher M. Robinson served on 5/9/2019, through Sheila Embry, Citizenship & Immigration Services. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 5/30/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos. David Gulick served on 5/9/2019, through Christina Lara, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, on behalf of the US Attorney's Office, District of Hawaii. (Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 5/30/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Executed: Christopher Robinson served on 5/9/2019, through Christina Lara, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, on behalf of the US Attorney's Office, District of Hawaii (Cosio, Fernando) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos Christopher Robinson Docket Text Modified on 5/20/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Executed: Jeffrey Sawyer served on 5/6/2019, through Sheila Embry, Citizenship & Immigration Services (Cosio, Fernando) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos Jeffrey Sawyer Docket Text Modified on 5/20/2019 (jo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Executed: David Gulick served on 5/9/2019, through Sheila Embry, Citizenship & Immigration Services (Cosio, Fernando) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos Proof of Service Docket Text Modified on 5/17/2019 (jo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Sawyer (jo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Christopher M. Robinson (jo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan (jo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to David Gulick (jo)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Lee Francis Cissna (jo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASES - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00229 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019. (emt, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint, by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit C)(Cosio, Fernando) Docket Text Modified on 5/6/2019 (jo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Cosio, Fernando)
May 3, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. No further action necessary. The filing party please refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer)". (cib)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 6/28/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00229-JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs(Cosio, Fernando) Modified on 5/3/2019 (cib).
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2195710.), filed by Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos and Patricia Marchetti Maia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A USCIS Decision, #2 Exhibit B Legal Residence Card)(Cosio, Fernando) Modified docket text to fix parties names on 5/3/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos, et al v. McAleenan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Jorge Melo Santos
Represented By: Fernando L. Cosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Marchetti Maia
Represented By: Fernando L. Cosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Sawyer
Represented By: Cara E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Represented By: Cara E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Robinson
Represented By: Cara E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gulick
Represented By: Cara E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Cara E. Alsterberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?