Lee v. Field
Appellant: Adam Lee
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Appellee: Dane S. Field
Case Number: 1:2019cv00237
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 EO: Briefing deadlines issued. Oral Arguments are set for 10/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 4, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Adam Lee. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness. (cib)
May 13, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASE has been served by First Class Mail to Adam Lee at the address of record on May 13, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI'S REFERRED CIVIL CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/8/2019. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00237 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings, EFFECTIVE 5/13/2019 . (emt, )
May 7, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 2 Notice of Case Assignment has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Adam Lee. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00237-LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-1356, BAP HI-19-1108. (Attachments: #1 Opitinal Appellee Statement of Election To Proceed In District Court, #2 Transmittal of Appeal, #3 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #4 ORDER Granting In Part Trustee's Motion For Turnover And/Or Monetary Judgment Against The Debtor In The Amount of $162,488.97)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Adam Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dane S. Field
Represented By: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?