Ferreira v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Ferreira
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00241
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. (Moriyama, Rachel)
June 5, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a certified copy of the #7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS has been served by First Class Mail to Danielle Rose Beaver, Esq. at the address of record on June 5, 2019. Additionally, the following documents were included in the mailing to Ms. Beaver: 1) certified copies of the Complaint; 2) issued summons and Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons forms (AO 398 form), Waiver of Service of Summons forms (AO 399 form) with instructions (Notice to Parties); 3) USM-285 forms. A certified copy of the #7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS shall be served to the U.S. Marshals Service via interoffice delivery. (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Danielle Rose Beaver, Esq., re ECF No. #7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, dated June 5, 2019. (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Department of Justice. (emt, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #6 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/5/2019. (emt, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE Application Amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Danielle Rose Beaver appearing for Plaintiff Christopher Allen Ferreira (Beaver, Danielle) Modified docketing event on 6/4/2019 to reflect "Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis" (emt, ).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #4 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/30/2019. For these reasons, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's IFP Application. If Plaintiff wishes to resubmit an Application addressing the identified deficiencies, he must do so by June 19, 2019. Plaintiff must provide all information requested in the Application; in particular, the frequency with which he received the identified benefits, and whether he expects to continue receiving these amounts in the future. If Plaintiff does not intend to seek IFP status, he must pay the applicable filing fee by June 19, 2019. Failure to file another IFP Application or submit the applicable filing fee by June 19, 2019 will result in the dismissal of this action. (emt, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 EX PARTE Application Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Danielle Rose Beaver appearing for Plaintiff Christopher Allen Ferreira (Beaver, Danielle) Modified docketing event on 5/29/2019 to reflect "Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis" (emt, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00241 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Beaver, Danielle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Christopher Allen Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaver, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferreira v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Allen Ferreira
Represented By: Danielle Rose Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?