Planning Department of The County of Kauai v. JJGRAT, LLC
Plaintiff: Planning Department of The County of Kauai
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, JJGRAT, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00247
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of No Position re #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support of Motion by JJGRAT, LLC filed on June 12, 2019, filed by Planning Department of The County of Kauai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sasaki, Maryann)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support of Motion : Motion Hearing is set for 7/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (tbf, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 EP: Status Conference - Discussion held re the status of these 3 similar cases and the pending motion to consolidate, for which a hearing has not yet been scheduled.Ms. Sasaki informed the Court that 3 additional similar cases will be filed.Also pending is another closely related case (CV 19-0024HG-KJM).Further discussion held.This hearing is continued for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to 7/30/19 @ 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Court converts the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to a Status Conference which will remain set for 6/17/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum in Support of Motion Joanna C. Zeigler appearing for Defendant JJGRAT, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna C. Zeigler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Zeigler, Joanna)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting for JJGRAT, LLC.. (Zeigler, Joanna)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement for JJGRAT LLC. (Zeigler, Joanna)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sasaki, Maryann)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Planning Department's ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed on May 17, 2019 by Planning Department of The County of Kauai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sasaki, Maryann)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant JJGRAT LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief Filed March 25, 2019, COUNTERCLAIM against Planning Department of The County of Kauai by JJGRAT, LLC.(Zeigler, Joanna)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/17/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) Modified on 5/14/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00247-JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JJGRAT, LLC from in the Circuit Courf of the Fifth Circuit, case number Civil No. 19-1-0046. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2200740), filed by JJGRAT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing)(Kugle, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planning Department of The County of Kauai v. JJGRAT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planning Department of The County of Kauai
Represented By: Maryann Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJGRAT, LLC
Represented By: Joanna C. Zeigler
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?