Ward v. Growing Keiki, LLC, The

Plaintiff: Daniel Ward
Defendant: The Growing Keiki, LLC and Growing Keiki, LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv00249
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 EO: At Lunsford Phillips' request and due to his unavailability for the next 8 weeks, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 9/24/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 9/17/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ward. Growing Keiki, LLC, The served on 7/2/2019. (emt, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Growing Keiki, LLC, The. (emt, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Growing Keiki, LLC, The, filed by Daniel Ward. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons)(Phillips, Lunsford) Modified on 5/17/2019 (emt, ).
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Growing Keiki, LLC. (cib)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00249-DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 14, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Incorrect Correct Case Number. Please be advised that document #1 contains an incorrect case number. The correct case number is CV 19-00249 in place of CV 19-00033. Counsel shall take the appropriate action as they deem necessary. (cib)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Growing Keiki,LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2201504.), filed by Daniel Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Phillips, Lunsford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Growing Keiki, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ward
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Growing Keiki, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Growing Keiki, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?