Rowan v. State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: George C. L. Rowan
Defendant: Public Safety Department and State of Hawaii
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv00254
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/12/2019. (1) The complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b)(1). (2) Rowan may file an amended pleading that cures the deficiencies in his claims on or before July 19, 2019 . (3) The Clerk SHALL send Rowan a blank prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he can comply with this Order if he elects to amend his complaint. (4) If Rowan fails to timely amend his pleadings or cure the noted deficiencies in his complaint, this suit may be AUTOMATICALLY DISMISSED without further notice, and he may incur a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - George C. L. Rowan served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 12, 2019. A copy of the Court's Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Rowan.
June 10, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION and #7 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION have been served by First Class Mail to George C. L. Rowan at the address of record on June 10, 2019. Additionally, a copy of each order was served to the Warden and Financial Office of Oahu Community Correctional Center, 2199 Kamehameha Highway, Honolulu, HI 96819. The Financial Department for the District of Hawaii, Department of Public Safety Litigation Coordinators Shelley Nobriga Harrington, Esq. and Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. received the order electronically at the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #5 , #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/10/2019. (emt, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/7/2019. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff George C. L. Rowan. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2019: #1 (unredacted) Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner) (emt, ).
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of George C. L. Rowan submitted re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
May 28, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Docket No. 3 has been served by First Class Mail to George C. L. Rowan to the address of record on May 28, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 EO: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint that is unsigned [ECF 1]. The Clerk is DIRECTED to return the complaint to Plaintiff to correct this deficiency. Plaintiff SHALL sign and return the pleading on or before June 11, 2019. Failure to do so shall result in the complaint being STRICKEN and this action being terminated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 28, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry and #1 Complaint have been served by First Class Mail to George Rowan at the address of record on May 28, 2019. A "business reply" envelope has been included in the mailing to Mr. Rowan. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
May 28, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by George C. L. Rowan is not signed. Mr. Rowan is instructed to sign the enclosed copy of the Complaint and return it to the Clerks' Office in the enclosed "business reply" envelope. (emt, )
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/15/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Clerk's Office Intake Staff mailed a copy of the order and prisoner IFP form to Plaintiff George C.L. Rowan on May 15, 2019.
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CIVIL CLAIM) against All Defendants - filed by George C. L. Rowan. The complaint is unsigned. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowan v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George C. L. Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Safety Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?