Takemoto, et al v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Robin Takemoto and Mahina Asuncion
Defendant: The Queen's Medical Center, Sungjin Song, M.D., Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A., United States of America, Ellie Cohen, M.D. and Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 93 Email to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader from Robert K. Fricke, Esq., dated July 8, 2020, re: request for a Status Conference for purposes of discussing the trial schedule, the upcoming settlement conference set for August 10, 2020, and a mediation before Dispute Prevention & Resolution scheduled for October 19, 2020 (jo)
July 7, 2020 Filing 92 Return of Service on Subpoena Kaiser Permanente was served on July 2, 2020 (Ruggles, Maegan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 91 Return of Service on Subpoena Pali Momi Medical Center was served on July 2, 2020 (Ruggles, Maegan)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FIRST STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 7/2/2020. (jo)
July 1, 2020 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions; Exhibits A-B to Kaiser Permanente (Ruggles, Maegan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Questions; Exhibits A-B to Pali Momi Medical Center (Ruggles, Maegan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Michael J. Van Dyke on behalf of Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Van Dyke, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 86 STIPULATION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND LACK OF INFORMED CONSENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MELISSA ALSBERGAS - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/18/2020. (jo)
June 16, 2020 Filing 85 STATEMENT re #79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DEFENDANT MELISSA ALSBERGAS, C.R.N.A.S CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.8 REGARDING HER MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES, FILED 6/10/20 [DOC. 79]; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Van Dyke, Michael)
June 16, 2020 Filing 84 EO: Given the current public health crisis, the court will notify the parties in due course whether the September 8, 2020 hearing on Defendants' motions for summary judgment, ECF Nos. #77 & #79 , will be held in court, by video conference, by telephone conference, or whether the matter will be submitted without a hearing under Local Rule 7.1(c). If all parties jointly desire one of those particular options, they may submit a letter request to Seabright_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
June 11, 2020 Filing 83 STATEMENT re #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; COS of Compliance with LR 7.8; COS filed by United States of America. (Yee, Harry)
June 10, 2020 Filing 82 EO: On June 9, 2020, Defendant United States filed a Motion for Summary Judgment, and on June 10, 2020, Defendant Melissa Alsbergas filed a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. ECF Nos. #77 , #79 . Upon review, it appears that neither the United States nor Alsbergas complied with LR7.8, which requires counsel for the moving party to certify that counsel has conferred with opposing counsel prior to filing certain dispositive motions in an attempt to partially or completely resolve the need for such motion. As to each motion, if such a conference has not yet occurred, the moving Defendant is DIRECTED to confer with opposing counsel by June 17, 2020 to discuss the motion and attempt partial or complete resolution. In any event, each moving Defendant must file a statement of compliance under LR 7.8 by June 22, 2020 (or sooner, if the conference has already occurred). Moving Defendants are cautioned that continued failure to comply with the Local Rules may result in the court striking future filings. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment, and #79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is set for 09/08/2020 at 10:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (rlfh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 80 CONCISE STATEMENT in Support re #79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Van Dyke, #2 Exhibit "1", #3 Exhibit "2", #4 Exhibit "3", #5 Certificate of Service)(Van Dyke, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Michael J. Van Dyke appearing for Defendant Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Van Dyke, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 78 CONCISE STATEMENT in Support re #77 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; COS ; COS filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Sterbis, M.D., #2 Exhibit "1", #3 Exhibit "2", #4 Exhibit "3", #5 Exhibit "4")(Yee, Harry)
June 9, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; COS Harry Yee appearing for Defendant United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion)(Yee, Harry)
June 3, 2020 Filing 76 Return of Service on Subpoena Reduce Reuse Recycling Services was served on May 29, 2020 (Cosgrove, Gail)
June 3, 2020 Filing 75 Return of Service on Subpoena Local 1186 IBEW was served on May 28, 2020 (Cosgrove, Gail)
June 3, 2020 Filing 74 Return of Service on Subpoena City Mill Co., Ltd. was served on May 28,2020 (Cosgrove, Gail)
June 3, 2020 Filing 73 Return of Service on Subpoena Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. was served on May 28, 2020 (Cosgrove, Gail)
May 27, 2020 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories, Exhibits A-B (Cosgrove, Gail)
May 27, 2020 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories, Exhibits A-B (Cosgrove, Gail)
May 27, 2020 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories, Exhibits A-B (Cosgrove, Gail)
May 27, 2020 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Notice of Taking Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories, Exhibits A-B (Cosgrove, Gail)
May 13, 2020 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (Re: Plaintiffs First Amended Initial Disclosures) (Fricke, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (re Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Expert Witnesses) (Fricke, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc. Re: Defendant Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories Dated December 6, 2019 (Bordner, William)
April 30, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Robert Brzezinski on behalf of The Queen's Medical Center (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Brzezinski, Stephen)
April 9, 2020 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents dated February 26, 2020 (Cosgrove, Gail)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES DEADLINE AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/30/2020. (jo)
February 26, 2020 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (Re: Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant The Queen's Medical Center) (Fricke, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc. Re: Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories Dated December 6, 2019 (Bordner, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Responses to 1) Plaintiffs First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Defendant The Queens Medical Center and 2) Defendant The Queens Medical Centers Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant The Queens Medical Center (Cosgrove, Gail)
February 12, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. [RE: (1) DEFENDANT MELISSA ALSBERGAS, C.R.N.A.S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; AND (2) DEFENDANT MELISSA ALSBERGAS, C.R.N.A.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS] (Inouye, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBIT A - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/12/2020. (jo)
February 11, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc. Re: Defendant Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents and Things Dated December 6, 2019 (Bordner, William)
February 5, 2020 Filing 56 [Proposed] STIPULATION STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by The Queen's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cosgrove, Gail) Docket Text Modified on 2/6/2020 (jo)
January 31, 2020 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (Re: (1) Plaintiff Robin Takemotos Response to Defendant The Queens Medical Center First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Robin Takemoto, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tracey A. Abrisce; (2) Plaintiff Robin Takemotos Response to Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Robin Takemoto, Individually; (3) Plaintiff Mahina Asuncions Response to Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Mahina Asuncion, as Next Friend of Minor Children, Z.P.A., Z.K.A.-A. And Z.K.A.-A.; (4) Plaintiff Mahina Asuncions Response to Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Mahina Asuncion, Individually; and (5) Plaintiffs Response to Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs) (Holden, Abigail)
January 31, 2020 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America [RE: DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS] (Yee, Harry)
January 31, 2020 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America [RE: DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICAS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES] (Yee, Harry)
January 15, 2020 Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE of Change of Address by William A. Bordner on behalf of Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.. (Bordner, William) Docket Text Modified on 1/15/2020 (jo)
January 13, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by William A. Bordner on behalf of Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.. (Bordner, William)
December 27, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Robin Takemoto, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tracey A. Abrisce (Cosgrove, Gail)
December 24, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff (1) Robin Takemoto, Individually, (2) Mahina Asuncion, Individually, (3) Mahina Auncion, as Next Friend of Minor Children Z.P.A., Z.K.A.-A., and Z.K.A.-A., and (4) Defendant The Queens Medical Centers First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs (Cosgrove, Gail) Modified on 12/26/2019 Note: This document is electronically signed by "/s/ Maegan A. Ruggles" (emt, ).
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (re: Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.).) (Fricke, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (re: Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.) (Fricke, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (re: Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant Queen's Medical Center) (Fricke, Robert)
December 6, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (re: Plaintiffs' First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant United States of America) (Fricke, Robert)
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENT re #32 Supplement filed by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures; Certificate of Service. (Van Dyke, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 42 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 41 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint by Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Van Dyke, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint ; COS by United States of America.(Yee, Harry)
October 18, 2019 Filing 37 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Gruebner, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint filed October 4, 2019 by The Queen's Medical Center.(Gruebner, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc. served on 10/7/2019. (Fricke, Robert) Modified on 10/8/2019 (jo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
October 4, 2019 Filing 33 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Fricke, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 10/7/2019 (jo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT re: #26 by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. First Supplemental Initial Disclosure. (Van Dyke, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SUBSTITUTING THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR DEFENDANT SUNGJIN SONG, M.D. - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/26/2019. Defendant Sungjin Song, M.D. terminated(jo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by United States of America of Substitution; COS United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rachel S. Moriyama)(Yee, Harry)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ELLIE COHEN, M.D. AS DEFENDANT AND SUBSTITUTION OF HAWAII RESIDENCY PROGRAMS, INC. AS A DEFENDANT - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/20/2019. (jo)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto (Re: Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures) (Fricke, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Queen's Medical Center Initial Disclosures (Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
September 3, 2019 Filing 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Van Dyke, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America [Re: Defendant United States of America's Initial Disclosures] (Yee, Harry)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/20/2019. (jo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - William Border present for Defendant Ellie Cohen, M.D., who has not yet filed an answer.Discussion had re: status of the case.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 11/10/20 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Seabright.Early Settlement Conference on call.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 11/10/2020 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/29/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/10/2020. Discovery due by 9/11/2020. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Inouye, Ryan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Holden, Abigail)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement ; COS. (Yee, Harry)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Planning Meeting ; Certificate of Service. (Fricke, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COS by United States of America.(Yee, Harry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.'s Answer to Complaint, Filed on May 17, 2019 [Document 1]; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Van Dyke, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Ellie Cohen, M.D. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Fricke, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Defendant Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A. served on 7/3/2019. (Fricke, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 7/5/2019 (jo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, and by agreement of the parties, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/19 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 8/20/2019 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 8/13/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Queen's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant The Queen's Medical Center's Demand For Jury Trial ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by The Queen's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana) Docket Text Modified on 6/20/2019 (jo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant The Queen's Medical Center's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed May 17, 2019; Certificate of Service by The Queen's Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Peacott-Ricardos, Alana)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Defendant United States of America served through Attorney General of the United States by Certified Mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Transmittal Letter to US Atty General, #2 Exhibit B - Return Receipt from US Atty General, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fricke, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 6/18/2019 (jo)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Defendant United States of America served on 6/4/2019 through Ann Yuuki. (Fricke, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 6/6/2019 (jo)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mahina Asuncion, Robin Takemoto. Defendant The Queen's Medical Center served on 5/30/2019, through Gail Cosgrove. (Fricke, Robert) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (jo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Holden, Abigail)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A., Ellie Cohen, M.D., Sungjin Song, M.D., The Queen's Medical Center, United States of America. (cib)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 7/15/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00257-JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt # 0975-2203817), filed by Robin Takemoto. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fricke, Robert) Modified on 5/20/2019 to add receipt number to docket text (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takemoto, et al v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Queen's Medical Center
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Represented By: Maegan A. W. Ruggles
Represented By: Gail Y. Cosgrove
Represented By: David A. Gruebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sungjin Song, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Alsbergas, C.R.N.A.
Represented By: Michael J. Van Dyke
Represented By: Ryan I. Inouye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellie Cohen, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Bordner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Takemoto
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Represented By: Abigail Marie Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahina Asuncion
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Represented By: Abigail Marie Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?