Yu v. Queen's Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Mihae Yu, M.D.
Defendant: Robb K. Ohtani, M.D., Dean Mikami, M.D., Leslie B. Chun, M.D., Queen's Medical Center, Doe Entities 1-10 and Jane and/or John Does 1-25
Case Number: 1:2019cv00258
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
2 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Mihae Yu, M.D. of Withdrawal of Counsel Mihae Yu, M.D.. (Szeto-Wong, Gina)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS THE QUEEN'S MEDICAL CENTER, ROBB K. OHTANI, M.D., LESLIE B. CHUN, M.D., AND DEAN MIKAMI, M.D. TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/21/2019. Defendants shall have an extension of time from June 17, 2019 up to and including August 16, 2019 within which to respond to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, filed on May 13, 2019. (jo)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION REGARDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 TRO filed in First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii) (jo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 EP: STATUS CONFERENCE held.Discussion held regarding the Stipulation Regarding Temporary Restraining Order submitted on May 24, 2019.The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 24, 2019 is VACATED.Further Status Conference re: Exhausted Remedies with Queen's Medical is set for July 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:57 - 10:02.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 EO: A status conference is set for for 06/03/2019, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 19-1-0746-05 9th Division (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Verified Complaint, #5 Defendants' Notice of Removal) (jo)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Queen's Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent The Queen's Health Systems for Queen's Medical Center.. (Petrus, Barbara)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/22/2019. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT for all further proceedings. Please reflect new civil number CV 19-00258 JMS-KJM on all further filings . (emt, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00258 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 6/24/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) (jo) Modified on 5/21/2019 (emt, ). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00258 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Queen's Medical Center, Leslie B. Chun, Robb K Ohtani, Dean Mikami, M.D. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 19-1-0746-05. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2204526), filed by Queen's Medical Center, Leslie B. Chun, Robb K Ohtani, Dean Mikami, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #2 Certificate of Service)(Petrus, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu v. Queen's Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mihae Yu, M.D.
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Della A. Belatti
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robb K. Ohtani, M.D.
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Represented By: Barbara A. Petrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Mikami, M.D.
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Represented By: Barbara A. Petrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie B. Chun, M.D.
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Represented By: Barbara A. Petrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen's Medical Center
Represented By: Alana Peacott-Ricardos
Represented By: Barbara A. Petrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?