Paggeot v. Kai Bear Inc.
Plaintiff: Andre Paggeot
Defendant: Kai Bear Inc. dba Kai Bear Sport Fishing and Kai Bear Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00260 SOM-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 EO: The Court directs the Clerks Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as the Magistrate Judge on this case. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, Ralph)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andre Paggeot re: Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Juliano, Jeffre)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kai Bear Inc. (re Defendant's Initial Disclosures) (O'Neill, Ralph)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff Andre Paggeot. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Juliano, Jeffre)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting Defendant's Supplemental. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, Ralph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Andre Paggeot. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Juliano, Jeffre)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kai Bear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, Ralph)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kai Bear Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(O'Neill, Ralph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Paggeot. Kai Bear Inc. served on 6/4/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Juliano, Jeffre) Modified on 6/7/2019 (emt, ).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/22/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kai Bear Inc. (emt, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00260 RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kai Bear Inc. dba Kai Bear Sport Fishing ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2206242.), filed by Andre Paggeot. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Juliano, Jeffre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paggeot v. Kai Bear Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kai Bear Inc. dba Kai Bear Sport Fishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kai Bear Inc.
Represented By: Ralph J. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Paggeot
Represented By: Jeffre W. Juliano
Represented By: Lahela H. Hite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?