Concannon v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Christian B. Concannon
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv00267
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (apg, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/14/2019. (jo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diane C. Haar. (Haar, Diane)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 EO: On 5/29/19, Plaintiff Christian Concannon, filed a Complaint for Review of Social Security Disability and Supplemental Security Income Benefits Determinations ("Complaint") (ECF No. 2) and an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ("Application") (ECF No. 5). Although Plaintiff provided information about his income in the Application, he did not indicate whether the income is on a daily, weekly, monthly or annual basis. Plaintiff may supplement or amend his application to include this information by 6/28/19. The information provided should be in a declaration. re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Christian B. Concannon (Haar, Diane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00267-ACK-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT(signed) against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Christian B. Concannon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Modified on 5/29/2019 to reflect plaintiff's counsel signed complaint (cib).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Christian B. Concannon against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Christian B. Concannon.Plaintiff's attorney signature omitted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Modified docket text to reflect attorney's signature omitted on 5/29/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concannon v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian B. Concannon
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?