State of Hawaii v. Stone, et al
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Defendant: Cynthia A. Stone and Robert L. Stone
Case Number: 1:2019cv00272
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Hawaii re #13 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Extend the Deadline for the Meeting of the Parties (Evers, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 EO: On 7/4/19, Plaintiff State of Hawaii Office of Consumer Protection filed an Ex Parte Motion for Continuance of Scheduling Conference and Extension of the Deadline for the Meeting of the Parties ("Ex Parte Motion") [ECF No. 13]. The Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion. The Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. is continued to 9/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. The deadlines for the conference of the parties and the report shall be based on the new Rule 16 Scheduling Conference date (9/9/19) and LR26.1.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(shm)
July 4, 2019 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Extend the Deadline for the Meeting of the Parties James F. Evers appearing for Plaintiff State of Hawaii (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Evers, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Hawaii re #11 Waiver of Service Executed, #10 Waiver of Service Executed (Evers, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Hawaii. Cynthia A. Stone waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Evers, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Hawaii. Robert L. Stone waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Evers, James)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Consent Election Form. (emt, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form - Consent To Jurisdiction By United States Magistrate Judge)(cib) *** The party filing the case is responsible for serving all parties with this Notice of Assignment and the attached Election Form.
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert L. Stone and Cynthia A. Stone (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - Cynthia Stone)(cib)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 7/29/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00272-RT on all further pleadings. (cib)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Evers, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Evers, James)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Exhibits "A" - "RR" against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2209980.), filed by State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Hawaii Disbarment Order, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Illinois Disbarment, #3 Exhibit C Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D Notice of Resignation, #5 Exhibit E Order Allowing Resignation in Lieu of Discipline, #6 Exhibit F Order of the Bankruptcy Court, #7 Exhibit G Notice of Removal of Stone from Case, #8 Exhibit H Order of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, #9 Exhibit I Geshell transcript from EUO of 2018.8.31 with cs, #10 Exhibit J EUO Geshell Exs 1-11, bates-stamped 1-166_Red, #11 Exhibit K Geshell post-EUO doc production_Red, #12 Exhibit L BMO response to subpoena 2018.1.19, selected pages_Red, #13 Exhibit M Court Filing for Castro of 2017.8.22, #14 Exhibit N Court Filing for Castro of 2017.9.23_Red, #15 Exhibit O Court Filing for Watson of 2017.11.14 (after Gilardy was dead), #16 Exhibit P BMO Records for GAH Law Group_Red, #17 Exhibit Q Electronically Transferred Funds in 2018 to GAH Law Group, #18 Exhibit R McKellar Declaration re M. Danielson filed 2019.1.25, #19 Exhibit S Navy FCU Statement ETF to GAH Law Group, #20 Exhibit T Transcript, Roundpoint v. Dimitrion, hearing of 2018.6.19, #21 Exhibit U Transcript, Deutche Bank v. Gordon Moore, 2018.5.29, #22 Exhibit V Trancript, Bank NY Mellon v. DeShaw, hearing of 2019.3.12, #23 Exhibit W Transcript, Bank NY Mellon v. DeShaw, 2019.4.2, #24 Exhibit X Abing transcript from EUO of 2018.8.30, #25 Exhibit Y Abing EUO Exhibits 1-18_Red opt, #26 Exhibit Z Transcript, Pennymac v. Abing, hearing of 2018.8.14, #27 Exhibit AA Stone's credit card payment to Rosenberg_Red, #28 Exhibit BB Abing letter and declaration of 2018.10.12_Red, #29 Exhibit CC Abing Payments Post-EUO, #30 Exhibit DD Aqua Legal (bates-stamped) 141-182 (Cabral motion) opt, #31 Exhibit EE Aqua Legal (bates-stamped 1127-1128), #32 Exhibit FF Aqua Legal (bates-stamped 480), #33 Exhibit GG Aqua Legal (bates-stamped 783-859)_Red, #34 Exhibit HH Aqua Legal (bates-stamped 705), #35 Exhibit II Aqua Legal (bates-stamped 1510-1515), #36 Exhibit JJ Transcript, JPMorgan Chase v. Cabral, hearing of 2018.7.10, #37 Exhibit KK Rodil's Pro Se Answer, CoC, 3rd Party C filed 2019.2.20, #38 Exhibit LL Domingo's Pro Se Answer, CoC, CrC, 3rd Party C dated 2019.2.25, #39 Exhibit MM Rodil - Amended Answer filed by McFarlin, #40 Exhibit NN Rodil - Stipulation to Dismiss Rodil's Claims, #41 Exhibit OO McFarlin email of 2019.4.13 re Rodil, #42 Exhibit PP Rodil - proposed opposition to MSJ, #43 Exhibit QQ Rodil's pro se filed opposition to MSJ of 2019.04.16, #44 Exhibit RR Rodil's pro se filed exhibits opposing MSJ of 2019.04.17, #45 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Hawaii v. Stone, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii
Represented By: James F. Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?