Flores v. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa
Plaintiff: Victoria C. Flores
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria C. Flores. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa served on 7/8/2019. (Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 7/23/2019 (jo)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, and to allow Defendant additional time to respond to the Complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/05/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 09/30/2019, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 09/23/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa (jo)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa, filed by Victoria C. Flores.(Ho, Timothy) Docket Text Modified on 7/5/2019 (jo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Victoria C. Flores. (Ho, Timothy)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/5/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00287-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ;Demand for Jury Trial against Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2213702.), filed by Victoria C. Flores.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria C. Flores
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Vista at Waikoloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?