Huber v. Dyson
Plaintiff: Hans Huber
Defendant: Flourish Kitchens LLC, Todd Dyson, John Gorman, John Does 1-10, Robert Manes, Jane Doe 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Kevin Baer, Doe Entities 1-10 and Light Engine Design Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00293
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Brown as to Plaintiff Hans Huber re #11 .Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/18/2019. (cib)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Plaintiff's request, and to allow Plaintiff additional time to serve the defendants, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/05/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 09/06/2019, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 08/30/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
July 16, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. - Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that document #11 requires the judges signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers email address. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (cib)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael F. Brown, Esq. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2233069.Dennis W. King appearing for Plaintiff Hans Huber (King, Dennis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/5/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Flourish Kitchens LLC. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Light Engine Design Corp. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert Manes. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Gorman. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kevin Baer. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Todd Dyson. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00293 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; SUMMONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2214665.), filed by Hans Huber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hayakawa, Taiki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huber v. Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flourish Kitchens LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Manes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Baer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Light Engine Design Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Huber
Represented By: Dennis W. King
Represented By: Taiki Noah Hayakawa
Represented By: Michael F. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?