Roessler et al v. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa
Plaintiff: Zapar, Inc. and Roger Roessler
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa
Case Number: 1:2019cv00303
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Roessler, Zapar, Inc.. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa. (Ho, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 08/12/2019 is CONTINUED to 9/30/2019 at 09:00AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(mrf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa. (cib)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Court RESCHEDULES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 @ 9:00 AM to 8:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/12/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00303 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Roger Roessler, Zapar, Inc.. (Ho, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2216172.), filed by Roger Roessler, Zapar, Inc..(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roessler et al v. Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Vista Waikoloa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zapar, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Roessler
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?