S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC vs. Graves

Plaintiff: S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC
Defendant: Darren Graves
Case Number: 1:2019cv00310
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 30 EO: A Further Settlement Conference with Plaintiff's representative and Plaintiff's counsel is set for 8/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. A Confidential Settlement Conference Statement is due no later than 8/20/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 5, 2019 Filing 29 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(tyk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 28 Letter addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from William L. Shipley, Jr., Esq., dated July 26, 2019 re Plaintiff's Letter Brief. (cib)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 8/12/2019 to 9/17/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 EP: Discovery Hearing held on 7/30/2019. Discussion held regarding limited discovery in advance of preliminary injunction hearing. The Court finds good cause to permit limited discovery in advance of the preliminary injunction hearing. Please refer to attached Minutes for further details. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 Letter addressed to Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi from Leighton M. Hara, Esq., dated J7/26/2019 re: Issues relating to the hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii. (cib)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 EO: The Court has received the parties' submission of proposed interrogatories that the parties wish to serve in advance of the Hearing on the Preliminary Injunction and sets a Discovery Conference for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 EO: A Further Settlement Conference with Defendant Darren Graves and his counsel is set for 8/13/2019 at 02:00 PM. in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due no later than 8/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 EO: The Court DIRECTS the parties to submit the specific interrogatories, if any, that the party wishes to serve in advance of the Hearing on the Preliminary Injunction to the Court for review and ruling no later than 7/17/2019. The proposed discovery shall be submitted by email to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(agh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 EP: Status Conference held on 7/12/2019 regarding issues relating to the motion for preliminary injunction and discovery. The Court will schedule settlement discussions with each side to take place after the Opposition to the #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is filed. No further status conference set at this time. The Court will issue an order regarding discovery. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:30 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Keiko Murata Ueki on behalf of Darren Graves on behalf of Darren Graves. (Ueki, Jennifer)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Ota on behalf of Darren Graves on behalf of Darren Graves. (Ota, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 EO: A Status Conference is set for 7/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The parties must submit letters to the Court detailing the matters to be discussed at the Status Conference no later than noon on 7/11/2019, to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Leighton M. Hara on behalf of Darren Graves on behalf of Darren Graves. (Hara, Leighton)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 EP: Status Conference held on 7/5/2019. #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction By Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii. Motion Hearing is set for 8/30/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (Court Reporter Debi Read) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, ) (Main Document 16 replaced on 7/5/2019) (wnn, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 EO: COURT ORDER RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction By Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii, #1 Complaint. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Status Conference is set for 7/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC. All Defendants. (Shipley, William)
June 19, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY.No further action necessary. Assigned case number and judge's initials. Please be advised that document #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC is missing the case number and the initials of the judge(s)assigned. For future filings, please include case number as follows: CV 19-00310-LEK-WRP. (cib)
June 19, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that document #11 Waiver of Service Executed filed by S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC reflects an incomplete pdf attachment. The main document reflects a blank waiver of service. The filing party shall resubmit completed executed waiver of service. (cib)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction By Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii William L. Shipley, Jr appearing for Plaintiff S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lynn Puana MD, #2 Declaration Stefanie Bade-Castro, #3 Declaration Justin Gay, #4 Certificate of Service)(Shipley, William)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC. All Defendants. (Shipley, William) Modified on 6/20/2019 to reflect incomplete filing. (cib)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 EP: Status Conference held on 6/14/2019. (Court Reporter Debi Read) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 EO: COURT ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/12/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 EO: Status Conference is set for 6/14/2019 at 11:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 13, 2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY. Please be advised that the Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order attached to the #1 Complaint filed by S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC, should be filed as separate docket entries. For e-filing purposes, select the filing events "Preliminary Injunction" and " Temporary Restraining Order" from the "Motions" category. Each motion should be filed as separate docket entries. The filing party should provide courtesy copies as soon as possible. (emt, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00310 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 13, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The filing party is advised that the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, attached to docket entry number #1 Complaint, filed by S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC, should be filed as a separate docket entry. For e-filing purposes, select the filing event "Preliminary Injunction" from the "Motions" category. (emt, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00310 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by S&G LABS, HAWAII. (Shipley, William)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Theft of Trade Secrets against DARREN GRAVES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2216759.), filed by S&G LABS, HAWAII. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration Lynn Puana, M.D., #3 Declaration Stefanie Bade-Castro, #4 Declaration Justin Gay, #5 Main Document Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order Pending Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Hearing )(Shipley, William) Modified on 6/13/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC vs. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Graves
Represented By: William N. Ota
Represented By: Jennifer Keiko Murata Ueki
Represented By: Leighton M. Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&G Labs Hawaii, LLC
Represented By: William L. Shipley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?