Hale v. Lloyd's London; et al.
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hale
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd., Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10, Doe Unincorporated Associations 1-10, Christine Michelle Gumbs, Lloyd's London, Jerry G. Manin, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Business Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00314
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 EX PARTE Request Errata to Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Lloyd's, London [Dkt 33] Stanley H Roehrig appearing for Plaintiff Michael W. Hale (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Roehrig, Stanley)
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #33 EX PARTE Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Lloyd's, London Response to [Dkt. 33] Ex Parte Request for Default Against Defendant Lloyds, London filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Rogers, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 EX PARTE Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Lloyd's, London Stanley H Roehrig appearing for Plaintiff Michael W. Hale (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stanley H. Roehrig, #2 Exhibit A (Return and Acknowledgment of Service as to Lloyd's London, CV 19-1-0143) , #3 Entry of Default)(Roehrig, Stanley) Modified on 8/15/2019 (emt, ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 32 Joinder re #30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Jerry G. Manin, Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd., Christine Michelle Gumbs, #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michael W. Hale filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Rogers, James)
August 12, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christine Michelle Gumbs, Jerry G. Manin, Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakashima, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 29 On July 18, 2019, Plaintiff Michael W. Hale filed:MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND. (ECF No. 27).Defendants shall file their Oppositions on or before Monday, August 12, 2019.Plaintiff shall file his Reply on or before Monday, August 26, 2019.A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Remand (ECF No. 27) shall be held on Monday, October 7, 2019, at 11:00 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (tl, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 Errata re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Shima, Van-Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court Van-Alan H. Shima appearing for Plaintiff Michael W. Hale (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Van-Alan H. Shima, #3 Declaration of Hans P. Meier, #4 Exhibit "1", #5 Exhibit "2", #6 Exhibit "3", #7 Exhibit "4", #8 Exhibit "5", #9 Exhibit "6", #10 Exhibit "7", #11 Exhibit "8", #12 Exhibit "9", #13 Exhibit "10", #14 Exhibit "11", #15 Exhibit "12", #16 Certificate of Service)(Shima, Van-Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Van-Alan H. Shima on behalf of Michael W. Hale on behalf of Michael W. Hale. (Shima, Van-Alan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 EO: On 7/16/19, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for Extension or Enlargement of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike Defendant Lloyd's, London as a Party and Resetting the August 1, 2019 Hearing Date ("Ex Parte Motion") (ECF No. 19). Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019, filed on 6/21/19 ("Motion to Strike") was due on 7/11/19. Plaintiff represents that he intends to file a motion to remand by 7/18/19 and thus, seeks a 30-day extension from the date the motion to remand is ruled on by the Court for filing his opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike. During a status conference with the parties on 7/18/19 (ECF No. 22), all Defendants confirmed that they did not object to the Ex Parte Motion. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Ex Parte Motion. The Court agrees with the parties that the motion to remand should be decided first to determine whether there is a need to rule on the Motion to Strike. Because the motion to remand has yet to be filed, the Court continues the Motion to Strike from 8/1/19 at 9:30 a.m. to 11/14/19 at 9:30 a.m. The Court may elect to continue the hearing date on the Motion to Strike should the hearing fall on a date that is less than 30 days from the Court's ruling on the motion to remand. granting #19 Ex Parte Request; #7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9. Motion Hearing is set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 EO: The Court schedules a Telephone Status Conference for 10/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Counsel will be emailed the conference call information. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 EO: The Court continues the #7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9 set for 8/1/190 @ 9:30 AM to 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. The Court also continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/19 @ 9:00 AM to 11/14/2019 @ 9:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/7/19. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 EP: Telephone Status Conference - Discussion held re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension or Enlargement of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike Defendant Lloyds London as a Party and Resetting the 8/1/19 Hearing Date #19 .No opposition to this ex parte application, and the Court will grant this ex parte application in light of the comments this morning. Mr. Roehrig stated that he will be filing a motion for remand today. Court will reschedule the Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed 5/16/19 after the motion for remand is filed and set for hearing in the normal course.The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/19 @ 9:00 a.m. will be continued by agreement of counsel to a date after the hearing on the motion for remand by a separate EO.Status Conference held on 7/18/2019, re #19 EX PARTE Request For Extension or Enlargement of time. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 21 EO: The Court schedules a Telephone Status Conference for 7/18/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Conference call information will be emailed to counsel. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael W. Hale re #19 EX PARTE Request For Extension or Enlargement of time (Roehrig, Stanley)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 EX PARTE Request For Extension or Enlargement of time Stanley H Roehrig appearing for Plaintiff Michael W. Hale (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stanley H Roehrig, #2 Order)(Roehrig, Stanley)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakashima, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd., Jerry G. Manin and Christine Michelle Gumbs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement [Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy Number HGMH17103]. (Amatore, Erika)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT of No Position re #7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9 filed by Christine Michelle Gumbs, Jerry G. Manin, Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9 filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakashima, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Amatore, Erika)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed May 16, 2019 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nakashima, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Christine Michelle Gumbs, Jerry G. Manin, Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9 : Motion Hearing is set for 8/1/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (tbf, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London.(Amatore, Erika)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint Filed May 16, 2019 [Doc. 1-1]; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits 1-9 Erika L. T. Amatore appearing for Defendant Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - FAC, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Acceptance of Service, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Acceptance of Service, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Email, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Acceptance of Service, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Answer)(Amatore, Erika)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika L. T. Amatore on behalf of Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London on behalf of Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Amatore, Erika)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Jade)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Ching, Jade)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 7/22/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00314 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC from Third Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number Civil No. 19-1-0143. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2219382), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ching, Jade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Lloyd's London; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyramid Insurance Centre, Ltd.
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Unincorporated Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Michelle Gumbs
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry G. Manin
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London
Represented By: James Blaine Rogers, III
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Erika L. T. Amatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ryan B. Kasten
Represented By: Jade L. Ching
Represented By: David A. Nakashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Business Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hale
Represented By: Nathan P. Roehrig
Represented By: Stanley H Roehrig
Represented By: Margaret E. Ward
Represented By: Van-Alan H. Shima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?