Viernes v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Brackett, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/29/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 08/22/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velocity Investments, LLC. (Odani, Norman)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Class Action Complaint for Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, Filed on 06/19/19 by Velocity Investments, LLC.(Odani, Norman)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26f Conference Held. (Brackett, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Viernes. Velocity Investments, LLC served on 7/15/2019 through Marvin Pang - PC . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 7/18/2019 (emt, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC. (cib)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00317-JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT For Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, Exhibits A through B, and Verification against Velocity Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2219961.), filed by Ronald Viernes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Verification of Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) Modified on 6/20/2019 to add class action to docket text (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viernes v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Norman K. Odani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?