Viernes v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00318
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff. (Brackett, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/29/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 08/22/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velocity Investments, LLC. (Odani, Norman)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint For Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, Filed on 06/19/19 by Velocity Investments, LLC.(Odani, Norman)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26f Conference Held. (Brackett, Justin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Viernes. Velocity Investments, LLC served on 7/17/2019. (Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 7/19/2019 (jo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Errata re #9 Summons Returned Executed Summons Not Yet Served in this Matter. (Brackett, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 **Document STRICKEN pursuant to ECF #10 ** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Viernes. Velocity Investments, LLC. (Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 7/18/2019 (jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Velocity Investments, LLC (jo)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC (jo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00318 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, EXHIBITS A THROUGH B, AND VERIFICATION against Velocity Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2219971.), filed by Ronald Viernes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration Verification of Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 6/20/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viernes v. Velocity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jodie D. Roeca
Represented By: James Shin
Represented By: Norman K. Odani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Viernes
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?