Hopkins v. Aila et al
Plaintiff: John B. Hopkins
Defendant: Wren Wescoatt, III, Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, Wallace A. Ishibashi, Michael P. Kahikina, Pauline Namu'o, Hawaiian Homes Commission, William Aila, David B. Ka'apu, United States, Randy Awo, Kip Akana, Jobie Masagatani, Zachary Helm and State of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2019cv00321
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/19/2019. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/19/2019. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 08/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/13/2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 05/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m.in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/25/2020. Discovery due by 06/26/2020. Settlement discussion held between the parties. No settlement reached at this time.If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Wes Weber Porter's Courtroom Manager, Mary Feria at (808) 541-3087 at anytime.(FTR-Ctrm C7 9:10 - 9:30.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER will be held in Courtroom 7 instead of Chambers. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 31 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER will be held in Courtroom 7 instead of Chambers. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 30 Scheduling Conference Statement Scheduling Conference Stmnt & COS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS)(Kanakaole, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William Aila, Kip Akana, Randy Awo, Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, Hawaiian Homes Commission, Zachary Helm, Wallace A. Ishibashi, David B. Ka'apu, Michael P. Kahikina, Jobie Masagatani, Pauline Namu'o, State of Hawaii, Wren Wescoatt, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kanakaole, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. State of Hawaii served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. William Aila served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Wallace A. Ishibashi served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. David B. Ka'apu served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Pauline Namu'o served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Zachary Helm served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Randy Awo served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Wren Wescoatt, III served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Michael P. Kahikina served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Kip Akana served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. Jobie Masagatani served on 6/21/2019. (emt, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John B. Hopkins. United States served on 7/3/2019. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to United States. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to State of Hawaii. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to David B. Ka'apu. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Wallace A. Ishibashi. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Pauline Namu'o. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Zachary Helm. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Randy Awo. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Wren Wescoatt, III. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael P. Kahikina. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kip Akana. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jobie Masagatani. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Aila. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI026717 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants - filed by John B. Hopkins. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI026717 (emt, ) Modified on 6/21/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Aila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wren Wescoatt, III
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace A. Ishibashi
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael P. Kahikina
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Namu'o
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Homes Commission
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Aila
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Ka'apu
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Awo
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Akana
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jobie Masagatani
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Helm
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Represented By: Ryan K.P. Kanakaole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?