Takara v. Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Akemi Takara
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Arlette S. Harada and Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00322
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Counsel Steven K.S. Chung informs the Court that the parties have agreed on an extension of time for Defendants to answer and request a continuance of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. To allow parties sufficient time to complete their LR 26.1 conference, submit a report of the parties, and submit a scheduling conference statement, the request is hereby GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 10/07/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 09/30/2019.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ekimoto & Morris, LLC served on 7/10/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara. (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add service date (cib).
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Arlette S. Harada served on 7/10/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara.. (Ho, Timothy) Modified to add service date on 7/23/2019 (cib).
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe served ib 7/9/2019 filed by Brooke Akemi Takara. . (Ho, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2019 to add service date (cib).
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC, Arlette S. Harada. (Attachments: #1 issued summons Arlette S. Harada, #2 issued summons Ekimoto & Morris, LLC)(cib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Ho, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLC, Arlette S. Harada, filed by Brooke Akemi Takara.(Ho, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00322-LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Brooke A. Takara. (Ho, Timothy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC, Arlette S. Harada ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2220974.), filed by Brooke A. Takara.(Ho, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takara v. Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of Apartment Owners of Harbor Pointe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlette S. Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekimoto & Morris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Akemi Takara
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Michael L. Iosua
Represented By: Timothy E. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?