Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Prado
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Gerard Prado and DOES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00323
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.. Gerard Prado waiver sent on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 EO: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #11 Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Service Complaint and Summons. Plaintiff's new deadline to serve the defendants is 12/21/2019. In addition, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/19/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 01/21/2020, at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 01/14/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield2)
July 13, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration re Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/3/2019. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
June 24, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright shall be served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 on June 25, 2019. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/19/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. Copyright Report Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gerard Prado. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00323 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc for Hunter Killer Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2221826.), filed by Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc. v. Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Prado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?