Minesen Company, The v. United States Department of the Army; et al.
Plaintiff: Minesen Company, The
Defendant: United States Department of the Army and United States Army Installation Management Command
Case Number: 1:2019cv00326
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 EO: In light of #17 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Action Without Prejudiced filed on 7/4/2019, the Court terminates #4 Plaintiff's Application For Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The hearing on said motion set for 7/8/2019 and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 are VACATED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
July 4, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minesen Company, The re #17 Notice of Dismissal (Wong, Jason)
July 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Dismissal Minesen Company, The. (Wong, Jason)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #4 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ; COS filed by United States Department of the Army. (Butler, Jeremy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 EP: Status Conference. Discussion held. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: -- Government's written submission on the TRO or the Complaint is due by noon on Wednesday, July 3, 2019.-- Plaintiff's reply brief to the Government's submission is due by Friday, July 5, 2019.Hearing on #4 Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is set for Monday, July 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. before Judge Derrick K. Watson.If the parties wish to submit on their papers and mutually waive oral argument, they are to notify the Court. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J. Butler on behalf of United States Army Installation Management Command, United States Department of the Army on behalf of United States Army Installation Management Command, United States Department of the Army. (Butler, Jeremy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minesen Company, The re #12 Supplement, (Wong, Jason)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Max Jensen re #4 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Minesen Company, The by Minesen Company, The First Supplemental Declaration of Max Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 )(Wong, Jason) Modified on 6/28/2019 (emt, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Status Conference is set for 6/28/2019 at 08:45 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minesen Company, The. (Wong, Jason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States Department of the Army, by and through the Secretary of the Army, Mark Esper, in his official capacity. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Army Installation Management Command, by and through its Commander, Ltg. Bradley Becker, in his official capacity. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00326 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. The filing party shall remit the courtesy copies as soon as possible. (emt, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Jason G.F. Wong appearing for Plaintiff The Minesen Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support , #2 Declaration Max Jensen , #3 Exhibit 1 , #4 Exhibit 2 , #5 Exhibit 3 , #6 Exhibit 4 , #7 Exhibit 5 , #8 Exhibit 6 , #9 Exhibit 7 )(Wong, Jason) Modified on 6/25/2019 (emt, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Wong, Jason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Wong, Jason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by The Minesen Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 , #2 Exhibit 2 , #3 Exhibit 3 , #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wong, Jason) Modified on 6/25/2019 (emt, ). Modified on 6/25/2019: receipt: 0975-2222533, $ 400.00 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minesen Company, The v. United States Department of the Army; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minesen Company, The
Represented By: Jason G.F. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Army
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Installation Management Command
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?