Flores v. City and County of Honolulu, et al
Plaintiff: Karl Flores
Defendant: Joshua M. Kirito, City and County of Honolulu, John Does 1-10 and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 9/23/2019 to 11/12/2019 at 9:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on #9 Defendants City and County of Honolulu and Joshua M. Kirito's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed on June 26, 2019 is set for 10/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Mitsuko Takahashi appearing for Defendants Joshua M. Kirito, City and County of Honolulu (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)(Takahashi, Mitsuko)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karl Flores. Joshua M. Kirito served on 7/23/2019 . (Bouslog, Christopher) Modified on 7/26/2019 (emt, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Court finds good cause to grant Plaintiff's request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to allow additional time to serve Defendants. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2019 is CONTINUED to 9/23/2019 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karl Flores. City and County of Honolulu waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Bouslog, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu, Joshua M. Kirito. (cib)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00329-DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (cib)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City and County of Honolulu, Joshua M. Kirito ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2223170.), filed by Karl Flores. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bouslog, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. City and County of Honolulu, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua M. Kirito
Represented By: Mitsuko Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Mitsuko Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Flores
Represented By: Christopher S. Bouslog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?