Stremel v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stremel
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00345
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Stremel. United States of America served on 7/15/2019. (emt, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 (AMENDED) Summons Issued as to United States of America. (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Sink, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan Stremel.(Sink, William) Modified on 7/8/2019 (emt, ).
July 2, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. The filing party may wish to review the following: LR100.10.1.(b) Personal Identifiers, Names of minor children, LR100.10.2. Redaction/Reference List and LR100.10.3. Responsibility of Counsel, re docket number #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Stremel. (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00345 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Sink, William)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2226235.), filed by Jonathan Stremel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sink, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stremel v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stremel
Represented By: William Fenton Sink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?