Makekau v. Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nakai Makekau
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Captain Jacque Mulleitner, Warden Barbera Taylor and Captain Alika Delosantos
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00361
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #6 Order, blank prisoner civil rights complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(a) re #1 .(1) The Complaint is DISMISSED for the reasons stated above, pursuant to28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A(b)(1).(2) Makekau may file an amended pleading as permitted by this Order on orbefore September 23, 2019. Failure to timely file an amended pleading that curesthe deficiencies discussed herein may result in dismissal of this action withoutfurther notice and result in a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g).(3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Makekau a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he may comply with the directions of this Order if he electsto file an amended complaint. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/9/2019. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 2, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis Application re #4 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/1/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filedby Plaintiff Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 11, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis re #2 . The IFP Application is therefore DENIED as incomplete. Makekau is DIRECTED to submit a complete IFP Application that contains the information listed above on or before August 12, 2019. Failure to timely do so will result in automatic dismissal of this suit without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Olivares v. Marshall, 59 F.3d 109, 112 (9th Cir. 1995). The court will take no action on Makekau's submissions until he has either paid the filing fee or has been granted IFP status. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/11/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 9, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Nakai Makekau (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Captain Alika Delosantos, Department of Public Safety, Captain Jacque Mulleitner, Warden Barbera Taylor, filed by Jeffrey Nakai Makekau. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makekau v. Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jacque Mulleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Barbera Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Alika Delosantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Nakai Makekau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?