McAlman v. Bernhardt
Plaintiff: Roberta J. McAlman
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 EO: EO: Robert McAlman is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/19 @ 9:00 AM (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (3) DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/8/2019. "Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's IFP Application is GRANTED, the Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim, and the Request for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint by September 6, 2019, to attempt to cure the deficiencies set forth above. Failure to file an amended complaint by September 6, 2019 will result in automatic dismissal of this action. To assist Plaintiff should she choose the file an amended complaint, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a copy of the court's form Complaint for Employment Discrimination." (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Plaintiff Roberta McAlman will be served by First Class Mail on August 9, 2019 along with a copy of the Court's form Complaint for Employment Discrimination to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST For Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964 - by Plaintiff Roberta J. McAlman (jo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION To Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Roberta J. McAlman (jo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against David L. Bernhardt - filed by Roberta J. McAlman (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents (EEOC Decision & Order), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlman v. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta J. McAlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?