Pollet v. Costco Whole Salers
Plaintiff: Eric Pollet
Defendant: Costco Whole Salers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00372
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Eric Pollet. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 12, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Order with blank IFP forms, #1 Complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Eric Pollet. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/11/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Whole Salers, filed by Eric Pollet. Filed as "Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint." (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollet v. Costco Whole Salers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Whole Salers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Pollet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?