Amiri vs. County of Maui; et al.
Plaintiff: Avid Amiri
Defendant: County of Maui and Doe Defendants 1-100
Case Number: 1:2019cv00373
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ferren, Gregory)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement pursuant to Rule 16. (Holiona, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 EO: John Holiona is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conferene set for 9/9/19 @ 9:00 AM. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Meeting . (Ferren, Gregory) Docket text modified on 8/20/2019 (emt, ).
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant County of Maui's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by County of Maui.(Holiona, John)
July 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avid Amiri. County of Maui served on 7/16/2019 . (Ferren, Gregory) Modified on 7/22/2019 (emt, ).
July 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avid Amiri. (Ferren, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County of Maui. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00373 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Ferren, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Avid Amiri, Deutsche International Trust II. (Ferren, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Maui, Doe Defendants 1-100 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2230697.), filed by Deutsche International Trust II, Avid Amiri. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Ferren, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amiri vs. County of Maui; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Maui
Represented By: John Koa Holiona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avid Amiri
Represented By: Gregory A. Ferren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?