Hackett v. Saipan BPL
Plaintiff: Clifford Ray Hackett
Defendant: Saipan BPL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00375
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EO: In light of the #8 Order (1) Dismissing Complaint and (2) Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis issued by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE dismissing the Complaint with leave to amend by September 9, 2019, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/09/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 10/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference is set for 10/10/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. #8 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS). Mail sent to Clifford Ray Hackett at Gen Delivery, Hilo, HI 96720 returned undeliverable, "unclaimed". Note: The Clerk's Office also served the Order and IFP application by email to Clifford Ray Hackett at 3659745@gmail.com on August 7, 2019. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 8 - Order (1) Dismissing Complaint and (2) Denying Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #2 AO 240 - Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (emt, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re: ECF No. #7 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs). Mail sent to Clifford Ray Hackett at Gen Delivery, Hilo, HI 96720 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Clifford Ray Hackett at Gen Delivery, Hilo, HI 96720 returned undeliverable, unclaimed. (Attachments: #1 copy of Complaint, #2 copy of Deficiency Order, #3 copy of Request to File by Fax, #4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Clerk's Memo re Corporate Disclosures) (emt, )
August 7, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #8 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs have been served by First Class Mail to Clifford Ray Hackett at the address of record on August 7, 2019. Additionally, the order and IFP form were emailed to Clifford Ray Hackett at 3659745@gmail.com. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (1) DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND (2) DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re #1 , #7 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/7/2019. In accordance with the foregoing, Court: (1) DISMISSES the Complaint with leave to amend and (2) DENIES Plaintiffs IFP Application. If Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, he must comply with the following requirements: (1) Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint is September 9, 2019 ; (2) Plaintiff's amended complaint should be titled "First Amended Complaint"; (3) Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above; and (4) Plaintiff must file an IFP Application with the amended complaint or pay the applicable filing fee. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to timely file an amended pleading that conforms with this Order and file an IFP Application or pay the applicable filing fee will result in the automatic dismissal of this action. (emt, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Clifford Ray Hackett. The party caption reflects "Island Hop" as the Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Facsimile Transmittal) (emt, )
July 16, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 6 EO has been served by First Class Mail to Plaintiff at his address of record on 07/16/2019. (mansfield2)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The Court has reviewed #2 Plaintiff's request for accommodation and finds good cause to GRANT Plaintiff leave to file by fax.For each fax filing, Plaintiff must include a separate cover sheet that states the case name, the docket number, the title of the attached filing, and the number of pages faxed. Plaintiff must also comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10.2. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 07/16/2019. (mansfield2)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - The order was served via First Class Mail to Clifford Ray Hackett at the address of record and by email to the following email address: 3659745@gmail.com on July 15, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and Costs (AO 240), Complaint, Motion to File by Fax, and Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Order were emailed to Mr. Hackett on July 15, 2019.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - The order was served to Clifford Ray Hackett via First Class Mail to the address of record and by email to the following email address: 3659745@gmail.com on July 15, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees and Costs (AO 240), Complaint, Motion to File by Fax, and Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Order were emailed to Mr. Hackett on July 15, 2019. Modified on 7/15/2019 (emt, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Letter addressed to Clifford Ray Hackett from the Clerk's Office Intake Staff re return of documents received via fax on June 3, 2019. Note: The contents of the mailing sent to Mr. Hackett at Gen Delivery, Hilo, HI 96720 were returned to the Clerk's Office as "unclaimed". (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Permission to File by Fax - by Plaintiff Clifford Ray Hackett. (Note: Mr. Hackett's request was received by email to Clerk's Office staff.) (emt, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saipan BPL - filed by Clifford Ray Hackett. Note: The complaint is not signed. (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackett v. Saipan BPL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saipan BPL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Ray Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?