Douglas, et al. v. United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Chantaya Douglas and Melvin Douglas
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10 and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00376
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/9/2019. "Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR for a settlement conference, beginning in chambers, on August 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m." (jo)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/9/2019. (jo)
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 11/3/2020 at 09:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 7/30/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 6/3/2020. Discovery due by 9/4/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m. ) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant's. (Butler, Jeremy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J. Butler on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Butler, Jeremy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Chantaya Douglas, Melvin Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration Declaration of Matthew C. Winter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Douglas, Chantaya Douglas. United States of America served on 7/18/2019. (Winter, Matthew) Docket Text Modified on 7/22/2019 (jo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED Declaration of Matthew C. Winter - filed by Chantaya Douglas, Melvin Douglas re: #8 (jo)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM re: #6 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/16/2019. (jo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America (jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE Motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonym Matthew C. Winter appearing for Plaintiffs Chantaya Douglas, Melvin Douglas (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Order)(Winter, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 9/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00376 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Winter, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2231501.), filed by Melvin Douglas, Chantaya Douglas (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas, et al. v. United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantaya Douglas
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Matthew C. Winter
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Douglas
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Matthew C. Winter
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jeremy J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?