Jackson, Jr. v. Magoon Estates Limited et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Jackson, Jr. and Elijah Jackson
Defendant: Winter Haven Hospital Inc., Susan Ballard, Magoon Estate Limited/Hula's Bar and Lei Stand, Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher Law Firm, Neurology and Neurosurgery Associates, P.A., Dr. Masao Takai Taki, M.D., Employees 1-100, Genevieve Magoon, Dr. Shailesh Rajuru, Winter Haven Hospital, Inc., Dr. Allen Delgado, M.D., Bay Care Health Systems, Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc., Ward White and Associated, P.A., Fronk Clinic, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Hawaiian Airlines Incorporated, Watson Clinic Foundation Inc., Art Ushijima, Dr. Jill Hoggard Green, John Does 1-100, Glenn Wysock, Dr. John Amann, MD, 1st Insurance Company of Hawaii, Ltd, Disparti Law Group, P.A, Magoon Estates Limited, Watson Clinic-Mulberry, Judith Ann Pavey, Esq., Queens Health Systems/Queens's Medical Center, Neurology, John "Jack&quot Magoon, Jr., Dr. John O. Susac, MD, Dr. Masao Takai, M.D., Honolulu Police Department, George Magoon, Sr., Fronk Clinic Incorporated, Jane Does 1-100, Bob Magoon and Magoon Trust
Case Number: 1:2019cv00380
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 USCA Case Number 19-16661 for #14 Notice of Appeal, filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. This appeal is subject to a pre-filing review order entered in case number 93-80377. The appeal will be reviewed by the Court to determine whether it willbe permitted to proceed. Do not file a brief until/unless directed by the Court to do so.Briefing schedule will be set by future court order only if the Court determines that the appeal should be allowed to proceed.(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #14 Notice of Appeal, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. (cib)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order Dismissing Case, #7 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr.(no ifp or fee submitted) 9CCA Case Number: 19-16661(Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cib, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 EO: Plaintiff's Motion For Extension of Time [ECF 12] is DENIED for the reasons set forth in the 07/30/2019 Order Dismissing Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) [ECF 6]. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #11 Supplement, #12 Notice (Other), has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE (MOTION) For Extension of Time filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND SUPPLEMENT or Companion to Civil Right Complaint Form filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. re #8 . (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 31, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #9 Affidavit, #10 Notice (Other), #8 Notice (Other), has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 30, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order Dismissing Case, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 7/30/2019 pursuant to #6 Order Dismissing Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Dismissing Action Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1915(g).(1) This action is DISMISSED without prejudice but without leave to file any new action in this court with respect to these claims and these Defendants.(2) The July 15, 2019 Deficiency Order, ECF No. #3 , is VACATED.(3) Any pending motions are DISMISSED. The court will take no action on any documents filed hereafter, beyond processing a notice of appeal.(4) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment and to close this case. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/30/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE - Durable Power of Attorney filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT Of Identity Or Proof of Identity filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - Supplement or Companion To Civil Right Complaint Form filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #5 Amended Complaint has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)
July 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 Notice (Other), has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - Durable Power of Attorney filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 16, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, #2 Notice (Other), #3 Order and two blank IFP forms has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Elijah Jackson, Jr. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib) Modified to add two blank ifp forms included in mailing (cib).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/15/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Pendency Of Other Actions or Related Cases filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elijah Jackson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 mailing documentation)(cib)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson, Jr. v. Magoon Estates Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter Haven Hospital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magoon Estate Limited/Hula's Bar and Lei Stand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starn O'Toole Marcus & Fisher Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurology and Neurosurgery Associates, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Masao Takai Taki, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employees 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve Magoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shailesh Rajuru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winter Haven Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Allen Delgado, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Care Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Regional Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward White and Associated, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fronk Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Airlines Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Clinic Foundation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Ushijima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jill Hoggard Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Wysock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Amann, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Insurance Company of Hawaii, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disparti Law Group, P.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magoon Estates Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Clinic-Mulberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Ann Pavey, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queens Health Systems/Queens's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neurology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John "Jack&quot Magoon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John O. Susac, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Masao Takai, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Magoon, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fronk Clinic Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Magoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magoon Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?