Rich Sea Corp. v. Lam et al
Plaintiff: Rich Sea Corp.
Defendant: Wai Yin Lam and Dane S. Field
Case Number: 1:2019cv00381
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/9/2019. (emt, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 EO: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/17/2020 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/7/2020 09:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Order. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 EO: Pursuant to the August 8, 2019 Order adopting the Bankruptcy Court's recommendation to withdraw the reference to schedule a jury trial, ECF No. #6 , Magistrate Judge Porter shall issue a Scheduling Order setting a trial date and related pre-trial deadlines. Following the issuance of a Scheduling Order, the matter is referred to the Bankruptcy Court for all other purposes. The reference will be withdrawn ninety days before the trial date. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING BANKRUPTCY JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION TO DISTRICT COURT TO SCHEDULE JURY TRIAL re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/8/2019. (emt, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 EO: On July 15, 2019, the bankruptcy judge transmitted his Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial (the "Recommendation"). ECF No. 1-1. The Court finds this matter suitable for disposition without a hearing, pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d). The Court DIRECTS the parties to file any objections to the Recommendation by August 2, 2019. The Court will thereafter rule on the Recommendation. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(mrf)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine T. Chow on behalf of Dane S. Field on behalf of Dane S. Field. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chow, Elaine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Enver W. Painter, Jr on behalf of Dane S. Field on behalf of Dane S. Field. (Painter, Enver)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00381 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00888, A.P. No. 18-90030. (Attachments: #1 Recommendation to the District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial, #2 Rich Sea Corp.'s Scheduling Conference Statement, #3 Trustee's Scheduling Conference Statement, #4 Defendant Wai Yin Lam's Scheduling Conference Statement, #5 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 18-90030) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich Sea Corp. v. Lam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Sea Corp.
Represented By: Grant R. F. Allison
Represented By: Matthew C. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wai Yin Lam
Represented By: Steven Guttman
Represented By: Dawn A. Egusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane S. Field
Represented By: Carisa L. K. Duffy
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Represented By: Elaine T. Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?