Grandinetti v. Circuit Court of the Third Circuit et al
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti, Francis P. Grandinetti and Francis A. Grandinetti
Defendant: County of Hawaii, C&C of Honolulu, Judiciary, State of Hawaii, Circuit Court of the First Circuit and Circuit Court of the Third Circuit
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2019cv00384
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL re 6 - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 30, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 9 Minute Order has been served by First Class Mail to Francis Grandinetti at the address of record on August 30, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 EO: RE: Motion for Reconsideration [ECF 8]: Plaintiff's Motion, "FRCP 59(e) and 52(b), and 65 (TRO): Reconsideration of Order, 8/1/19" does not show that he was in imminent danger of serious physical injury when he commenced this action or otherwise persuade the Court to alter, amend, or reconsider its decision to dismiss this action without prejudice and the Motion is DENIED. The Court will take no further action on any documents filed in this action, beyond processing a notice of appeal. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 [MOTION for] Reconsideration of Order, 8/1/19 re #3 , #4 - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 [SUPPLEMENT] ("FRCP 52 (b), Additional Facts") - by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 EO: For the reasons stated in the 08/01/2019 Dismissal Order [ECF 3], Plaintiff/Petitioner's "Pro Se On Instant Motion for Relief Concerning a CCTC Hearing on July 26, 2019 (Friday), HI-AZ Video-Hearing; Renewed AEDPA Claims" [ECF 5], is DENIED. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION, Injunction Proofs ("Pro Se On Instant Motion for Relief Concerning a CCTC Hearing on July 26, 2019 (Friday), HI-AZ Video-Hearing; Renewed AEDPA Claims") - by Plaintiff Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 8/1/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #3 DISMISSAL ORDER. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 1, 2019.
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISMISSAL ORDER re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 8/1/2019. To the extent Grandinetti seeks habeas relief, his Petition is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Any request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. To the extent Grandinetti raises claims under 42 U.S.C. 1983, he may not proceed in forma pauperis. The July 17, 2019 Deficiency Order is VACATED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate this case. The Court will take no further action in this suit beyond processing any notice of appeal. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 1, 2019.
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/17/2019. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Francis Grandinetti served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 19, 2019. A filed copy of the Complaint was returned to Mr. Grandinetti.
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Francis Grandinetti. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandinetti v. Circuit Court of the Third Circuit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis P. Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis A. Grandinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&C of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judiciary, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Court of the First Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuit Court of the Third Circuit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?