Freitas v. Kobayashi
Petitioner: John Ferdinand Freitas
Respondent: Hiromichi Kobayashi
Case Number: 1:2019cv00388
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI026987 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (emt, )
July 31, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and #4 Clerk's Judgment have been served by First Class Mail to John Ferdinand Freitas at the address of record on July 31, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 7/31/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (emt, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/31/2019. (1) The Petition is DISMISSED without prejudice, but without leave to amend. (2) To the extent Petitioner raises conditions of confinement claims that do not impact the duration or fact of his detention, those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice to raising them in a civil rights action. (3) Petitioner cannot make a substantial showing that reasonable jurists would find the dismissal of his Petition either debatable or incorrect, therefore any request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. See Gonzalez v. Thaler, 565 U.S. 134, 141 (2012); Rule 11(a). (emt, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/22/2019. John Ferdinand Freitas served by First Class Mail to the address of record on July 23, 2019. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner form, its instructions and a file stamped copy of the Petition were included in the mailing to Mr. Freitas. (emt, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. S. 2241(c) - filed by John Ferdinand Freitas. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Ferdinand Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hiromichi Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?