HB Productions, Inc. v. John Doe, et al.
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe and Does 1-19
Interested Party: Jessica Beltran
Case Number: 1:2019cv00389
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION re #12 filed by Jessica Beltran (Attachments: #1 Letter from Charter Communications to Jessica Beltran dated August 30, 2019 with Subpoena) (jo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 EO: In light of the 14 ORDER granting 13 Ex Parte Motion, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 09/16/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 12/16/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/09/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Ex Parte Motion: The Court has reviewed and considered #13 HB Productions, Inc.'s First Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons ("Motion"), filed August 21, 2019. Finding good cause shown in the Motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion. HB Productions, Inc. shall serve the Defendants in this case by January 15, 2020. The Court shall issue a new Rule 16 scheduling conference date, continuing the September 16, 2019 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for at least 90 days.Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 08/29/2019. (mansfield1)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS FIRST MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re: #5 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 8/16/2019. (jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to John Doe dba YTS (jo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to John Doe dba YTS - Techmodo Limited (jo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 EX PARTE Motion PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATE SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT JOHN DOE dba YTS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration of Counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 19, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and AO 121 Form has been served by First Class Mail to Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 9/16/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re Motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00389-ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by HB Productions, Inc. HB Productions, Inc.. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by HB Productions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for HB Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Inducement, Contributory Copyright Infringement and Direct Copyright Infringement against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2234830.), filed by HB Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Stephanie Kessner, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry) Modified to remove alias from defendant John Doe name on 7/19/2019 (cib).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HB Productions, Inc. v. John Doe, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jessica Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?