Planning Department of the County of Kauai v. PMD Hanalei LLC
Plaintiff: Planning Department of the County of Kauai
Defendant: PMD Hanalei LLC, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00391
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing not held.Discussion held.The parties inform the Court that the State Court 5th Circuit recently ruled in favor of the homeowners, on procedural due process grounds, in a consolidated appeal of the Planning Commission's rulings. Following that, the parties have reached a tentative resolution.The Court sets a October 3, 2019 deadline for submission of the Stipulation for Dismissal to seabright_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.If the parties find that more time is needed to work on settlement documentation and obtaining signatures, they may request to extend this deadline. (FTR-Ctrm C6 9:46 - 9:55.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Zeigler, Joanna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement by Planning Department of the County of Kauai. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sasaki, Maryann)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief filed May 21, 2019, COUNTERCLAIM against Planning Department of the County of Kauai by PMD Hanalei LLC. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim)(Kugle, Gregory)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 EO: In light of the #5 Order Reassigning Case, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/26/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 09/03/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 08/27/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00391-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/8/2019. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI, MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 19-00391-JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief filed May 21, 2019 by PMD Hanalei LLC.(Kugle, Gregory)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00391 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PMD Hanalei LLC from Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number Civil No. 19-1-0077 JKW. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2235025), filed by PMD Hanalei LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice to Attorneys of Filing)(Kugle, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planning Department of the County of Kauai v. PMD Hanalei LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planning Department of the County of Kauai
Represented By: Maryann Sasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMD Hanalei LLC
Represented By: Gregory W. Kugle
Represented By: Joanna C. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?