Flores v. Ballard et al
Plaintiff: E. Kalani Flores
Defendant: Susan Ballard, Doe Corporations 1-100, Roe Corporations 1-100, Tivoli Faaumu, Richard Roes 1-100, John Does 1-100, Mary Roes 1-100, Doe Entities 1-100, Jane Does 1-100, Doe Partnerships 1-100, Roe Partnerships 1-100, Roe Entities 1-100 and Paul Ferreira
Case Number: 1:2019cv00395
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 Acknowledgment by the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re ECF #15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii re: ECF No. #15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, ECF NO. 8, dated July 26, 2019. (emt, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND, ECF NO. #8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/26/2019. In short, this action with the Amended Complaint as the operative pleading should be remanded to State Court. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, ECF No. 8, is GRANTED. The action is REMANDED forthwith to the Third Circuit Court for the State of Hawaii. (emt, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 EO: Hearing on #8 Motion to Remand to State Court set for 07/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT is hereby vacated. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tivoli Faaumu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lutey, Moana)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Susan Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nomura, Ernest)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT Defendant Paul Ferreira, in his capacity as the Chief of Police of the County of Hawaii's Statement of No Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand Under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Paul Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court is set for 07/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (rlfh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Errata re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nomura, Ernest)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Peter Stephen Roehrig Olson appearing for Plaintiff E. Kalani Flores (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Serivce)(Olson, Peter) Docket Text Modified on 7/25/2019 (jo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of Paul Ferreira on behalf of Paul Ferreira. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 EO: The court is informed that Plaintiff intends to file a motion to remand this action to state court. Given the subject-matter of the suit, such a motion must be filed by 5:00 p.m. today, July 24, 2019. Responses to the motion to remand are due by 5:00 p.m. Thursday, July 25, 2019. The court will hold a hearing on the motion to remand on Friday, July 26, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re: #4 (jo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against E. Kalani Flores, filed by E. Kalani Flores. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Olson, Peter) Docket Text Modified on 7/24/2019 (jo)
July 23, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 2 Notice of Case Assignment and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference shall be served by First Class Mail to Peter Stephen Roehrig Olson, Esq. at the address of record on July 24, 2019 and by email to polson@hawaiinuilawyer.com. A copy of the Court's CM/ECF Registration Form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Olson. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) Modified on 7/23/2019 (emt, ).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/26/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00395 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Susan Ballard from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit State of Hawaii, case number Civ. 19-1-190. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2236195), filed by Susan Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate of Service)(Nomura, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Ballard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ballard
Represented By: Ernest H. Nomura
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Corporations 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tivoli Faaumu
Represented By: Peter A. Hanano
Represented By: Moana Monique Lutey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roes 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roes 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Partnerships 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Entities 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ferreira
Represented By: Devin K. Horowitz
Represented By: Laureen L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Kalani Flores
Represented By: Peter Stephen Roehrig Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?